Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

HB1272 - Maryland Insurance Commissioner Enforcement - Specialty Mental Health Services and Payment of Claims - Sunset Extension

Health and Government Operations 3/15/2023 1:00:00 PM
Finance 3/23/2023 1:00:00 PM
As of: 5/26/2024 8:35:31 PM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Doyle, Lori FAV HB 1272-CBH-FAV.pdf HGO
Reck, Daniel MATClinics FAV No Testimony HGO
Cavathas, Dimitrios Lower Shore Clinic FAV No Testimony HGO
Chester, Chandra Families First Counseling and Psychiatry FAV No Testimony HGO
Duffy, Suzanne Concerned Citizen UNF No Testimony HGO
Martin, Dan Mental Health Association of Maryland FAV HB1272 MIA ASO Enforcement.pdf HGO
Tress, Andrew MD Insurance Administration FAV HB1272 - MIA - Support -FINAL.pdf HGO
Savage, Pat Maryland Psychological Association FAV MPA Testimony 2023 - Support - House Bill 1272 - M HGO
Bagnall, Heather FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
2022 Joint Chairmens Report (p. 90) Report on reco
2022-10-28 Legis Audit - BHA and Optum.pdf
Gaudenzia 2022-10-26 Letter to Schuh.pdf
HB1272_Sponsor_FAV.pdf
Letter to Schrader - Optum Billing Concerns.pdf
MADC Comments on Optum 11-01-2022.pdf
Optum Maryland Report-MCLH-2-2021-E-6.7.22 (1).pdf
PPT-CBH-MIA-MDH Briefing 11-1-22_.pdf
HGO
Delegate Bagnall, Delegate Bagnall FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HGO
Delegate Bagnall, Delegate Bagnall FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
FIN
Tress, Andrew MD Insurance Administration FAV HB1272 - MIA - Support -FINAL.pdf FIN
Rosier, Collan Pyramid Healthcare, Inc. INFO No Testimony FIN
Doyle, Lori FAV HB 1272-CBH-FAV-Senate.pdf FIN
Bagnall, Heather FAV 2022 Joint Chairmens Report (p. 90) Report on reco
2022-10-28 Legis Audit - BHA and Optum.pdf
Gaudenzia 2022-10-26 Letter to Schuh.pdf
Letter to Schrader - Optum Billing Concerns.pdf
MADC Comments on Optum 11-01-2022.pdf
Optum Maryland Report-MCLH-2-2021-E-6.7.22 (1).pdf
PPT-CBH-MIA-MDH Briefing 11-1-22_.pdf
Senate_HB1272_Bagnall_FAV.pdf
FIN
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 3-22-2023 at 325 PM FIN
Click to return on the top page