Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

HB1047 - Mail–In Voting Enhancement Act

Ways and Means 2/23/2021 1:30:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 4/1/2021 1:00:00 PM
As of: 12/7/2021 4:07:40 AM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Delegate Wilkins, Delegate Wilkins FAV Oral Testimony W&M
Shah, Rishi Maryland PIRG FAV Oral Testimony
HB1047_Maryland PIRG_FAV_Rishi Shah.pdf
W&M
O’Keeffe, Carol FAV HB01048-IndivisibleHoCoFAV-O'Keeffe.pdf W&M
Antoine, Joanne Common Cause Maryland FAV Oral Testimony
HB 1047 - Mail-In Voting Enhancement Act.pdf
HB 1047_1048 - Everyone Votes MD.docx.pdf
W&M
Chitalia, Suhani FAV 2021 PPM HB 1047 House Side.pdf W&M
Williams, Peggy UNF HB1047 UNFAVORABLE.pdf W&M
Tulkin, Josh MD Sierra Club FAV HB1047 - Mail-in Voting Enhancement Act - W&M - WI W&M
Berry, Katherine INFO HB1047 Mail In Voting Enhancement Act.pdf W&M
Kline, Audrey National Vote at Home Coalition FWA Oral Testimony
NVAHC testimony for MD HB 1047.pdf
W&M
Plante, Cecilia Maryland Legislative Coalition FAV HB1047_Mail-In_Voting_Enhancement_MLC_FAV.pdf W&M
Muhammad, Huzzaifa CAIR Office in Maryland FAV Oral Testimony
testimony.HB1047.pdf
W&M
Maneki, Sharon National Federation of the Blind of Maryland FWA Oral Testimony
Favorable with Amendment HB1047 Accessible Ballot
W&M
Saydjari, Omar Hold the Line-Maryland FAV HTL-MD-TestimonyHB1047-2021-02-19.pdf W&M
Britt, Adiena N/A FAV No Testimony W&M
Little, Rev. Kobi NAACP Maryland FAV Oral Testimony W&M
Millenson, Janet League of Women Voters of Maryland FAV Oral Testimony
LWVMD testimony - HB 1047 - Mail–In Voting Enhance
W&M
Klaitman, Jessica FAV Mail-in Voting Testimony.pdf W&M
Cooper, Charlie Get Money Out - Maryland FAV GMOM_HB1047test_022321.pdf W&M
Jackson, William FAV Oral Testimony
HB 1047.pdf
W&M
Wilkins, Jheanelle Maryland House of Delegates FAV Written Testimony_ HB1047 Mail-in Voting Enhanceme W&M
Delegate Wilkins, Delegate Wilkins FAV Oral Testimony EHE
Civic Design, Center for Center for Civic Design FAV Center for Civic Design- Comments on HB1047-mail-i EHE
Tulkin, Josh MD Sierra Club FAV HB1047 - Mail-in Voting Enhancement Act - EHEA - W EHE
Shah, Rishi Maryland PIRG FAV HB1047_Maryland PIRG_Rishi Shah_FAV.pdf EHE
Plante, Cecilia Maryland Legislative Coalition FAV HB1047_Mail-In_Voting_Enhancement_MLC_FAV.pdf EHE
Walmsley, Keith Maryland Developmental Disabilities Council FAV HB 1047 Senate Mail–In Voting Enhancement Act.pdf EHE
Antoine, Joanne Common Cause Maryland FAV Oral Testimony
HB 1047 - Mail-In Voting Enhancement Act.pdf
EHE
Bartlett, Olivia DoTheMostGood FAV No Testimony EHE
Millenson, Janet League of Women Voters of Maryland FAV Oral Testimony
LWVMD testimony for HB 1047 - Mail–In Voting Enhan
EHE
Britt, Adiena N/A FAV No Testimony EHE
Chitalia, Suhani FAV 2021 PPM HB 1047 Senate Side.pdf EHE
Kemerer, Hannibal Office of Attorney General FAV 2021-04-01 (Crossover) HB1047 (Support).pdf EHE
Ansah, Samuela American Civil Liberties Union FAV Oral Testimony
HB_1047_FAV_ACLUMD_ANSAH.pdf
EHE
Wilkins, Jheanelle Maryland House of Delegates FAV Oral Testimony
HB 1047 Sponsor Written Testimony (Delegate Jheane
EHE
Kline, Audrey National Vote at Home Coalition FAV Senate Version of testimony for MD HB 1047.pdf EHE
Jackson, William FAV Oral Testimony EHE
Click to return on the top page