Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

HB1041 - Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Religion and Disability

Judiciary 2/20/2024 1:00:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings 3/27/2024 1:00:00 PM
As of: 7/12/2024 6:29:52 AM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Delegate Cardin, Delegate Cardin FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Sirkel, Robin UNF No Testimony JUD
sirkel, jess UNF No Testimony JUD
Katcef, William Maryland State's Attorney's Association FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Hopkins, Barbara UNF No Testimony JUD
DOrazio, Peter Year UNF No Testimony JUD
Pedersen, Stacy UNF No Testimony JUD
Weisel, Meredith ADL FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
ADL MD Written Testimony - HB1041.pdf
JUD
miller, deborah JCRC of Greater Washington FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HB 1041 Hate Crimes and Disability.pdf
JUD
Kroll, Steven Maryland State's Attorneys' Association FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Sadwin, Rabbi Ariel Agudath Israel of Maryland FAV Agudah testimony - HB 1041- hate crimes - FAV - 20 JUD
mcavoy, vince UNF No Testimony JUD
Hudson, Lee Delaware-Maryland Synod, ELCA FAV No Testimony JUD
Meyerovich, Mark UNF No Testimony JUD
Cardin, Jon S. Delegate, House of Delegates FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Delegate Jon S. Cardin Testimony HB1041 20Feb2024.
JUD
Miicke, Sarah Baltimore Jewish Council FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HB1041 Disability and Religion hate crimes statute
JUD
Williams, Peggy UNF No Testimony JUD
Elbourn, James UNF No Testimony JUD
Horton, Cleveland Maryland Commission on Civil Rights FAV HB 1041 Hate Crimes.Religion.Diasability MCCR Test JUD
Ditraglia, Frank UNF No Testimony JUD
Spangler, Adam Office of Attorney General FAV 2024-02-20 HB 1041 (Support in Concept).pdf JUD
Purnell, Elizabeth Prince George's County State's Attorney's Office FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
JUD
Delegate Cardin, Delegate Cardin FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Spangler, Adam Office of Attorney General FAV 2024-03-27 HB 1041 (Support in Concept).pdf JPR
Weisel, Meredith ADL FAV ADL MD Written Testimony - HB1041 in JPR.pdf JPR
Jasen, Debi FAV No Testimony JPR
Miicke, Sarah Baltimore Jewish Council FAV HB1041 senate Disability and Religion hate crimes JPR
Lang, Alan UNF 2024 HB1041 Testimony Against 2024-03-27.pdf JPR
Love, William UNF No Testimony JPR
Reynolds-Dominguez, Camila FreeState Justice FAV No Testimony JPR
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 3-27-2024 at 938 AM JPR
Click to return on the top page