Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

HB0987 - State Government - Equal Access to Public Services for Individuals With Limited English Proficiency - Modifications

Health and Government Operations 3/5/2024 1:00:00 PM
As of: 7/24/2024 7:49:14 AM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Delegate Acevero, Delegate Acevero FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HGO
Lorraine, Lisa Jubilee Association of Maryland FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
2024-02-16 Org Testimony HB0987.pdf
HGO
Martinez, Olga FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
2024-03-05 Olga Martinez Testimony.pdf
HGO
Raine, James UNF No Testimony HGO
Kocik, Jimara HCAS FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
Copy of Copy of February 26th, 2024 Adbocacy lette
HGO
Douglass-Robinson, JD MD Hunger Solutions FAV HB 987 - FAV - MD Hunger Solutions.docx.pdf HGO
Katz, Janet UNF No Testimony HGO
Love, William UNF No Testimony HGO
Atkins, Robert UNF No Testimony HGO
Plante, Cecilia Maryland Legislative Coalition FAV HB0987_Equal_Access_to_Public_Services_for_Individ HGO
Bright Gordon, Cornelia Maryland Legal Aid FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Maryland Legal Aid Testimony HB 987.pdf
HGO
Malone, Robert The Arc Prince George's County FAV HB987 Language Access Testimony_Malone 2024.pdf HGO
Gallagher, George ICQ UNF No Testimony HGO
Hudson, Lee Delaware-Maryland Synod, ELCA FAV No Testimony HGO
Madaio, Michelle Homeless Persons Representation Project FAV HPRP_Favorable_HB987.pdf HGO
Sirkel, Robin UNF No Testimony HGO
Martinez, Madelin Catholic Charities FAV HB0987_CC_Martinez_FAV.pdf HGO
London, Rachel Maryland Developmental Disabilities Council INFO HB987.DD Coalition.LOI.pdf HGO
Arneson, Emily Kennedy Krieger Institute FAV HB987_LEP State Agency Coordinators_KennedyKrieger HGO
Hopkins, Barbara UNF No Testimony HGO
Woolard, Ashley Public Justice Center FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HB 987_PJC_FAVORABLE_HGO.pdf
HGO
Baur, Cynthia University of Maryland FWA Written_testimony_HB0987_Baur.pdf HGO
sirkel, jess UNF No Testimony HGO
Westervelt, Patricia Maryland Department of Transportation INFO HB0987 - MVA MTA SHA - Equal Access to Public Serv HGO
Volkmar, Leslie UNF No Testimony HGO
Diefenbach, Linda UNF No Testimony HGO
Kess, NaShona Maryland NAACP FAV No Testimony HGO
Lang, Alan UNF No Testimony HGO
Williams, Peggy UNF No Testimony HGO
Clark, Tiffany Office of the Attorney General INFO 2024-03-05 HB 987 (Informational).pdf HGO
Lopez, Katherine The Arc Prince George's County FAV HB 987 TESTIMONY .pdf HGO
Meyerovich, Mark UNF No Testimony HGO
Reynolds-Dominguez, Camila FreeState Justice FAV No Testimony HGO
Elbourn, James UNF No Testimony HGO
Ditraglia, Frank UNF No Testimony HGO
Click to return on the top page