Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

HB0981 - Principal Departments - Individuals With Limited English Proficiency - Access to Public Services

Health and Government Operations 3/5/2024 1:00:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment 3/28/2024 1:00:00 PM
As of: 7/22/2024 6:22:30 AM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Delegate Martinez, Delegate Martinez FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HGO
Lorraine, Lisa Jubilee Association of Maryland FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
2024-02-19 Org Testimony HB0981.pdf
HGO
London, Rachel Maryland Developmental Disabilities Council FWA HB981.DD Coalition.SWA.pdf HGO
Raine, James UNF No Testimony HGO
Kocik, Jimara HCAS FAV Copy of Copy of February 26th, 2024 Adbocacy lette HGO
Katz, Janet UNF No Testimony HGO
Love, William UNF No Testimony HGO
Atkins, Robert UNF No Testimony HGO
Malone, Robert The Arc Prince George's County FAV HB981 Language Access Testimony_Malone 2024 - 2.pd HGO
Gallagher, George ICQ UNF No Testimony HGO
Kraska, Jenny FAV Maryland Catholic Conference_FAV_HB981.pdf HGO
Sirkel, Robin UNF No Testimony HGO
Beatty, Carol Maryland Department of Disabilities FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HGO
Arneson, Emily Kennedy Krieger Institute FAV HB981_LEP Public Services_KennedyKrieger_support.p HGO
Hopkins, Barbara UNF No Testimony HGO
Belcastro, Lisa FAV HB 981 LEP .docx (2).pdf HGO
sirkel, jess UNF No Testimony HGO
Volkmar, Leslie UNF No Testimony HGO
Diefenbach, Linda UNF No Testimony HGO
Lang, Alan UNF No Testimony HGO
Williams, Peggy UNF No Testimony HGO
Meyerovich, Mark UNF No Testimony HGO
Reynolds-Dominguez, Camila FreeState Justice FAV No Testimony HGO
Elbourn, James UNF No Testimony HGO
Ditraglia, Frank UNF No Testimony HGO
Delegate Martinez, Delegate Martinez FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
EEE
Arneson, Emily Kennedy Krieger Institute FAV HB981_LEP Public Services_KennedyKrieger_support_S EEE
Price, Suzanne Concerned Citizen UNF HB0981 NO Globalism .pdf EEE
Lang, Alan UNF 2024 HB0981Testimony Against 2024-03-28.pdf EEE
Martinez, Madelin Catholic Charities FAV HB0981_CC_Martinez_FAV.pdf EEE
Themelis, Nina Mayor's Office of Government Relations FAV HB0981-EEE-FAV.pdf EEE
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 3-28-2024 at 935 AM EEE
Click to return on the top page