Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

HB0810 - Criminal Law - Rapid-Fire Activator - Switch/Auto-Sear

Judiciary 2/28/2024 1:00:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings 3/26/2024 1:00:00 PM
As of: 5/23/2024 9:05:59 PM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Speaker, Speaker FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Pedersen, Stacy UNF No Testimony JUD
Phelps, Mary UNF No Testimony JUD
DOrazio, Peter Year UNF No Testimony JUD
Love, William UNF No Testimony JUD
Harris, Rhea OAG FAV 2024-02-27 HB 810 (Support).pdf JUD
Katana, Shaoli Maryland State Bar Association FAV HB810 - Switch Auto-Sear Prohbition.pdf JUD
Shellenberger, Scott Baltimore County State's Attorney's Office FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Luedtke, Dawn FAV HB810 Luedtke Testimony FAV.pdf JUD
Gross, Kenneth UNF No Testimony JUD
Williams, Peggy UNF No Testimony JUD
Elbourn, James UNF No Testimony JUD
Loeffler, Derek Baltimore Police Department FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Wallace, Kathy Baltimore County Police Department FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Carr, Amanda Baltimore County Administration FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Buckler, Lauren FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
BaltimoreCounty_FAV_HB0810.pdf
JUD
Pennak, Mark Maryland Shall Issue, Inc. UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
MSI Testimony on HB 810 auto final revised1.pdf
MSI Testimony on HB 810 auto final revised1.pdf
JUD
Pennak, Mark Maryland Shall Issue, Inc. UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
MSI Testimony on HB 810 auto final revised1.pdf
MSI Testimony on HB 810 auto final revised1.pdf
JUD
Volkmar, Leslie UNF No Testimony JUD
Plante, Cecilia Maryland Legislative Coalition FAV HB0810_Weapon_Crimes_Switch_Auto-Sear_MLC_FAV.pdf JUD
Young, Bethany FAV HB 810 GOCPP Supports.pdf JUD
Diefenbach, Linda UNF No Testimony JUD
Lang, Alan UNF No Testimony JUD
McGuire, James UNF mcguire_unfavorable_hb-0810.pdf JUD
McCullough, Robert Baltimore County FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Price, Suzanne Concerned Citizen UNF No Testimony JUD
Ditraglia, Frank UNF No Testimony JUD
Arshavsky, Svetlana UNF No Testimony JUD
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 3-1-2024 at 1127 AM JUD
Speaker, Speaker FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Williams, Peggy UNF No Testimony JPR
Shellenberger, Scott Baltimore County State's Attorney's Office FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HB 810 - Rapid-Fire Activator-Switch Auto-Sear.pdf
JPR
Pedersen, Stacy UNF No Testimony JPR
Spangler, Adam Office of Attorney General FAV 2024-03-26 HB810 (Support).pdf JPR
Pennak, Mark Maryland Shall Issue, Inc. UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
MSI Testimony on HB 810 IN THE SENATE2.pdf
JPR
Young, Bethany FAV HB 810 GOCPP Supports (1).pdf JPR
Buckler, Lauren FWA BaltimoreCounty_FAV_HB0810.pdf JPR
McCullough, Robert Baltimore County FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Ferguson, Meg FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Plante, Cecilia Maryland Legislative Coalition FAV HB0810_Weapon_Crimes_Switch_Auto-Sear_MLC_FAV.pdf JPR
Love, William UNF HB0810 Testimony.pdf JPR
Volkmar, Leslie UNF No Testimony JPR
Diefenbach, Linda UNF No Testimony JPR
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 3-26-2024 at 853 AM JPR
Click to return on the top page