Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

HB0809 - Members of Boards, Committees, Commissions, Task Forces, or Workgroups – Removal or Suspension

Health and Government Operations 2/20/2024 1:00:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment 3/21/2024 1:00:00 PM
As of: 7/14/2024 12:09:11 PM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Delegate Vogel, Delegate Vogel FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HGO
Snyder, Abigail Baltimore Jewish Council FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HB809- Members of Boards, Committees, Commissions,
HGO
Weisel, Meredith ADL FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
ADL MD Written Testimony - HB809.pdf
HGO
miller, deborah JCRC of Greater Washington FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JCRC HB 809 - Members of Boards, Committees, Commi
HGO
Vogel, Joe FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HB809 Testimony Members of Boards, Committees, Com
HGO
Berns, Peter Office of the Attorney General of Maryland FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
2024-02-20 HB 809 (Amend).pdf
HGO
BERNSTEIN, JAY Jay Bernstein FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Bernstein testimony HB809.pdf
HGO
Waychoff, Amy FAV No Testimony HGO
Delegate Vogel, Delegate Vogel FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
EEE
Snyder, Abigail Baltimore Jewish Council FAV SENATE VERSION - HB809- Members of Boards, Committ EEE
Berns, Peter Office of the Attorney General of Maryland FAV 2024-03-20 HB 809 Senate (Favorable).pdf EEE
Vogel, Joe FAV HB809 Testimony Members of Boards, Committees, Com EEE
miller, deborah JCRC of Greater Washington FAV JCRC HB 809 Senate Sub Cmte Hearing - Members of B EEE
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 3-21-2024 at 845 AM EEE
Click to return on the top page