Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

HB0745 - Family Law - Protective Orders - Stalking and Permanent Protective Orders

Judiciary 2/15/2024 1:00:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings 4/2/2024 1:00:00 PM
As of: 7/19/2024 9:01:06 AM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Delegate Shetty, Delegate Shetty FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Ruth, Laure Women's Law Center of Maryland, Inc. FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
HB 745 - WLCMD - FWA.pdf
JUD
Shapiro, Melanie Maryland Network Against Domestic Violence FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
HB 745_MNADV_FWA.pdf
JUD
Jordan, Lisae C Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault (MCASA) FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
PO - perm and stalking - house testimony - 2024
JUD
Plante, Cecilia Maryland Legislative Coalition FAV HB0745_Protective_Orders_Crimes_of_Violence_and_St JUD
Harris, Rhea OAG FAV 2024-02-15 HB745 Support.pdf JUD
Feinstein, Debbie Montgomery County State's Attorney's Office FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Kunes, David Delegate Emily Shetty FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Testimony - Emily Shetty - HB 745 (1).pdf
JUD
Hausner, Deena House of Ruth Maryland FWA HB 745 - FWA - House of Ruth.pdf JUD
Rodriguez, Amanda Maryland Human Trafficking Task Force/ TurnAround, Inc. FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Emerson, Jessica The Human Trafficking Prevention Project FWA HTPP Testimony HB 745- FWA.pdf JUD
Williams, Turqoise Just Stalking: Maryland Resources FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
FAV
JUD
Lewis, Rolande FAV FAV JUD
Williams, Margo FAV FAV JUD
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 2-28-2024 at 1225 PM JUD
Delegate Shetty, Delegate Shetty FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Jordan, Lisae C Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault (MCASA) FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
PO - perm and stalking - house in senate testimon
JPR
Spangler, Adam Office of Attorney General FAV 2024-04-02 HB745 Support.pdf JPR
Hausner, Deena House of Ruth Maryland UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
HB 745 Senate - UNF - House of Ruth.pdf
JPR
Plante, Cecilia Maryland Legislative Coalition FAV HB0745_Protective_Orders_Crimes_of_Violence_and_St JPR
OMalley, Catherine Women's Law Center UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
HB 745 - Family Law - Protection Orders - Crimes o
JPR
Shapiro, Melanie Maryland Network Against Domestic Violence UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
HB 745_MNADV_OPP_JPR.pdf
JCADA Opposition Testimony_HB 745.pdf
JPR
Harris, Mrs. FAV No Testimony JPR
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 4-2-2024 at 858 AM JPR
Click to return on the top page