Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

HB0687 - Charles County – Governing Bodies of Common Ownership Communities – Member Training

Environment and Transportation 3/8/2024 1:00:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings 3/26/2024 1:00:00 PM
As of: 7/21/2024 7:40:48 AM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Charles County Delegation, Charles County Delegation FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
ENT
Moore, Ayaha FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
ENT
Graf, Lori Maryland Building Industry Association FWA MBIA Letter of Support with amendment HB 687.pdf ENT
Davis, Debra MGA FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HB687 - Member Training Testimony.pdf
HB687_Charles Co. Commissioners_FAV
ENT
Dunn, Steven Lerch, Early & Brewer, Chtd. UNF Testimony HB 687 Mar. 8 2024.pdf ENT
Collins, Reuben Charles County Government FAV HB 687. Support Letter FINAL .pdf ENT
Charles County Delegation, Charles County Delegation FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Dunn, Steven Lerch, Early & Brewer, Chtd. UNF Testimony HB 687 Mar. 26 2024 - Senate.pdf JPR
Davis, Debra MGA FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HB687 - Delegate Davis Testimony.pdf
HB687 - HOA Senate - Letter of Support.pdf
JPR
Collins, Reuben Charles County Government FAV SENATE.HB 687. Support Letter FINAL .pdf JPR
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 3-26-2024 at 853 AM JPR
Click to return on the top page