Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

HB0627 - Election Law - Automatic Voter Registration - State Correctional Facilities

Ways and Means 2/13/2024 1:00:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment 3/27/2024 1:00:00 PM
As of: 7/13/2024 6:12:40 PM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Delegate Wilkins, Delegate Wilkins FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
W&M
Mnck, Marijane Indivisible Howard County FAV HB627 Testimony.pdf W&M
Norling, Richard MD Sierra Club FAV HB627_MDSierraClub_fav - 13Feb2024.pdf W&M
Pedersen, Stacy UNF No Testimony W&M
Love, William UNF No Testimony W&M
Diefenbach, Linda UNF No Testimony W&M
Gross, Kenneth UNF No Testimony W&M
Antoine, Joanne Common Cause Maryland FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HB 627 - Election Law - Automatic Voter Registrati
W&M
DOrazio, Peter Year UNF No Testimony W&M
Morsberger, David UNF No Testimony W&M
Price, Suzanne Concerned Citizen UNF No Testimony W&M
Plante, Cecilia Maryland Legislative Coalition FAV HB0627_Automatic_Voter_Registration_Correctional_F W&M
Brown, Gregory ACLU of Maryland FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HB627 Favorable-2.pdf
W&M
Davis, Emily Fair Elections Center FAV Final FEC Testimony re MD HB 627.pdf W&M
Lang, Alan UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
2024 HB0627 Testimony Against 2024-02-13.pdf
W&M
Morris Desir, KESHIA Common Cause FAV NVPC letter of support_ HB 627 & HB 1022 2.9.24.pd W&M
Coolidge, Jacqueline FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
2-13 HB 627 Election Law - AVR - State Correctiona
W&M
Wilkins, Jheanelle Maryland House of Delegates FAV 2024 HB627 AVR Correctional Facilities Testimony.p W&M
Fink, Nelda UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
2024-HB0627-UNFavUNCONSTITUTIONAL.pdf
W&M
Muhlbauer, Isabelle LatinoJustice PRLDEF FAV MD HB 627 - Testimony in support.pdf W&M
Volkmar, Leslie UNF No Testimony W&M
Spangler, Adam Office of Attorney General FAV 2024-02-13 HB 627 (Support).pdf W&M
Cooper, Charlie Get Money Out -- Maryland FAV GMOM_HB627_021324.pdf W&M
sirkel, jess UNF No Testimony W&M
Downie, Yehesuah Campaign Legal Center FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
CLC_Testimony_HB0627.pdf
W&M
Williams, Peggy UNF No Testimony W&M
Reynolds-Dominguez, Camila FreeState Justice FAV No Testimony W&M
Elbourn, James UNF No Testimony W&M
Kahl, Catherine DPSCS INFO HB627_DPSCS_LOI.pdf W&M
Ditraglia, Frank UNF No Testimony W&M
Sirkel, Robin UNF No Testimony W&M
Nickerson, Sherry IRGA FAV HB0627 FAV W&M
Tischenko, Alex Institute for Response Government FAV IRGA Fav W&M
Delegate Wilkins, Delegate Wilkins FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
EEE
Williams, Peggy UNF HB0627Oppose.pdf EEE
Spangler, Adam Office of Attorney General FAV 2024-03-27 HB 627 (Support).pdf EEE
Cooper, Charlie Get Money Out -- Maryland FAV GMOM_HB627_Senate_032724.pdf EEE
Vernon, Michael UNF No Testimony EEE
Meyerovich, Mark UNF No Testimony EEE
Antoine, Joanne Common Cause Maryland FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HB 627 - Election Law - Automatic Voter Registrati
EEE
Kess, NaShona Maryland NAACP FAV HB 627 - Voter Registration - State Corrections (C EEE
Porter, Nicole The Sentencing Project FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
Nicole D. Porter testimony for MD House Bill 627.p
EEE
Plante, Cecilia Maryland Legislative Coalition FAV HB0627_Automatic_Voter_Registration_Correctional_F EEE
Lang, Alan UNF No Testimony EEE
Wilkins, Jheanelle Maryland House of Delegates FAV 2024 HB627 AVR Correctional Facilities Testimony ( EEE
Price, Suzanne Concerned Citizen UNF HB0627 SAY NO .pdf EEE
Brown, Gregory ACLU of Maryland FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HB627 Favorable-2.pdf
EEE
Tibbals, Trudy UNF No Testimony EEE
Love, William UNF No Testimony EEE
Elbourn, James UNF No Testimony EEE
Diefenbach, Linda UNF No Testimony EEE
Das, Christina NAACP LDF FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
LDF Hb 0627 MD Senate Written Testimony Final .pdf
EEE
Morris Desir, KESHIA Common Cause FAV NVPC letter of support_ HB 627 & HB 1022 2.9.24 (2
NVPC testimony MD AVR state corrections HB 627.pdf
EEE
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 3-27-2024 at 859 AM EEE
Click to return on the top page