Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

HB0567 - Maryland Online Data Privacy Act of 2024

Economic Matters 2/13/2024 1:00:00 PM
Finance 3/21/2024 1:00:00 PM
As of: 7/18/2024 5:52:31 PM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Delegate Love, Delegate Love FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
ECM
Kingman, Andrew State Privacy & Security Coalition UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
SPSC - MD HB 567 (Omnibus) - Unfavorable Testimony
ECM
Lehmen, Greg Private Testimony FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
von Lehmen__Staff_Maryland Cybersecurity Council__
ECM
Szabo, Carl NetChoice UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
ECM
Love, Sara FAV HB 567 - Delegate Love Privacy Written (1).pdf
HB 567 Attachment Delegate Love MD OPA 2024 Overvi
ECM
Pedersen, Stacy UNF No Testimony ECM
De Campos, Eric FWA HB 567_NICB_De Campos_FWA.pdf ECM
Love, William UNF No Testimony ECM
Diefenbach, Linda UNF No Testimony ECM
Grosshans, Holly Common Sense Media FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HB0567_Common Sense Media_Grosshans_FAV.pdf
ECM
durkin, margaret UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
[MD] HB 567 Privacy_TechNet_written_pdf.pdf
ECM
DOrazio, Peter Year UNF No Testimony ECM
Weintraub, Jason FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
ECM
Price, Suzanne Concerned Citizen UNF No Testimony ECM
Pinton, Luke Funk & Bolton, P.A. FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
ECM
Meyerovich, Mark UNF No Testimony ECM
Overturf, Matt NAMIC FWA 2024 NAMIC letter HB567 Consumer data privacy (2). ECM
Power, Matt Maryland Independent College and University Association FWA HB 567 Support with Amendments.pdf ECM
Enten, Robert Maryland Multi-Housing Assoc FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
ECM
Moore, Tonaeya CASH CAMPAIGN OF MARYLAND FAV 02.09 - HB 567 - Maryland Online Data Privacy Act ECM
Gregory, Jamie Calfee INFO No Testimony ECM
Lang, Alan UNF No Testimony ECM
Boender, Khara Computer & Communications Industry Association UNF Virtual - Oral Testimony
2024-2-9_CCIA Comments on MD HB 567.pdf
ECM
Sewell, George Security Industry Association UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
HB0567(MD) SIA Opposes - Final version.pdf
ECM
Vetter, Drew UNF HB0567_UNF_MTC_Maryland Online Data Privacy Act of ECM
locklair, cailey Maryland Retailers Association UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
ECM
Gallagher, Zoe Economic Action Maryland FAV HB567 Written Testimony .pdf ECM
Volkmar, Leslie UNF No Testimony ECM
Cross, RJ Maryland PIRG FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
Maryland PIRG HB0567 Testimony.pdf
ECM
mcavoy, vince UNF No Testimony ECM
Sakamoto-Wengel, Steven M. Consumer Protection Division FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
ECM
Hale, Laura American Heart Association FWA FavWAmed AHA Data Privacy HB 567.pdf ECM
Brown, Anthony Office of the Attorney General FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
ECM
Elliott, Robyn FAV 2024 ACNM HB 567 House Side.pdf
2024 LCPCM HB 567 House Side.pdf
2024 WLCM HB 567 House Side.pdf
ECM
Shapiro, Melanie Maryland Network Against Domestic Violence FAV HB 567_MNADV_FAV.pdf ECM
Davis, Dereck Maryland State Treasurer's Office FWA HB 567 - STO Testimony.pdf ECM
Lestock, Jake CTIA UNF CTIA Testimony in Opposition to Maryland HB 567 - ECM
Abrams, Hanna FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
OAG CPD Written Testimony HB 567.pdf
ECM
Garagiola, Hannah Compass Government Relations UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
ECM
Griffin, Andrew Maryland Chamber of Commerce UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
HB 567_Maryland Online Data Privacy Act of 2024_MD
ECM
Schwartz, Matt Consumer Reports FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
Re_ H.B. 567 Maryland Online Data Privacy Act - SU
ECM
Fitzgerald, Caitriona Electronic Privacy Information Center (EPIC) FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HB567_EPIC_Davisson_FAV.pdf
ECM
Williams, Peggy UNF No Testimony ECM
O'Halloran, Mike UNF No Testimony ECM
McNair, Lee Unitarian Universalist Environmental Justice Ministry FAV No Testimony ECM
Elbourn, James UNF No Testimony ECM
McDonough, Caitlin HJM FWA HB 567 Testimony - FWA - LexisNexis.pdf
HB567 - FWA - CSPRA.pdf
ECM
McLuckie, John Consumer Healthcare Products Association UNF CHPA Amendment Request MD HB 567.pdf ECM
Snyder, Rebecca UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
MDDC Oppose HB567.pdf
ECM
Price, Sarah Maryland Retailers Alliance UNF HB567_MRA_UNF.pdf ECM
Bogley, Laura Maryland Right to Life UNF UNFAVORABLE.HB567.SB541.MDRTL. L.Bogley.PDF ECM
Gregory, Jamie Calfee FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
ECM
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 2-22-2024 at 1137 AM ECM
Delegate Love, Delegate Love FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
FIN
Srebnik, Laura Biotechnology Innovation Organization (BIO) FWA MD HB 567 FWA 3-20.pdf FIN
Hale, Laura American Heart Association FWA Crossover FavWAmed AHA Data Privacy HB 567.pdf FIN
Sorell, Holly UNF No Testimony FIN
Love, Sara FAV HB 567 - Delegate Love Privacy Written (1).pdf
HB 567 Attachment Delegate Love MD OPA 2024 Overvi
FIN
locklair, cailey Maryland Retailers Association UNF HB567_MRA_UNF PDF.pdf
MD HB 567 Joint Opposition Letter.pdf
MSPC Ltr re MD HB 567 (Loyalty) - Mar 18 2024.pdf
FIN
Gallagher, Zoe Economic Action Maryland FAV _HB567 Written Testimony Crossfile FAV 2024.pdf FIN
Kendzierski, Philemon League of Life and Health Insurers, American Council of Life Insurers FWA National Insurance Crime Bureau One Pager UPDATED.
NICB Letter for HB 567 Senate - MD Online Privacy
FIN
Walmsley, Keith Walmsley Strategies FWA MSFT FWA HB576.pdf FIN
Allen, Hannah Maryland Chamber of Commerce UNF HB 567_MDCC and MTC Joint Letter_Maryland Online D FIN
Abrams, Hanna FAV CPD Written Testimony HB 567 in Senate Finance.pdf FIN
Sykes, Sharon American Hotel & Lodging Association UNF MD Data Privacy Testimony 3.20.24.pdf FIN
Vetter, Drew UNF UNF-Maryland Online Data Privacy Act of 2024-MTC-C FIN
Kozyckyj, Roxy AdvaMed FAV AdvaMed Written Testimony_MD HB 567_Senate Finance FIN
Kingman, Andrew State Privacy & Security Coalition UNF SPSC - MD HB 567 (Omnibus) - Testimony 03.20.pdf FIN
Harting, Marta Venable UNF HB 567_Opposed_Marriott and Under Armour.pdf FIN
Lenz, Matthew BSA The Software Alliance UNF BSA Letter on Maryland Online Data Privacy Act 3.2 FIN
Rohrer, Amy Maryland Hotel Lodging Association UNF HB 567 - UNF - MHLA.pdf FIN
Boender, Khara Computer & Communications Industry Association FWA 2024-3-20_CCIA Comments on MD HB 567.pdf FIN
Frazier, Travis Association of National Advertisers UNF Joint Ad Trade Letter Regarding Maryland HB 567.pd FIN
Price, Suzanne Concerned Citizen FAV HB0567 (1).pdf FIN
Lang, Alan UNF 2024 HB0567 Testimony Against 2024-03-21.pdf FIN
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 3-20-2024 at 826 PM FIN
Click to return on the top page