Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

HB0550 - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Vendor Contracts

Judiciary 3/5/2024 1:00:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings 3/26/2024 1:00:00 PM
As of: 7/19/2024 7:51:02 AM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Delegate Williams, Delegate Williams FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Ellis, Matthew FAV No Testimony JUD
Gardner, Rebecca FAV expunge HB550.pdf JUD
Miller, Linda Maryland Judiciary UNF hb550.pdf JUD
Emerson, Jessica The Human Trafficking Prevention Project FAV HTPP HB 550 Unit Rule Testimony- FAV.pdf JUD
Caroom, Philip Maryland Alliance for Justice Reform FAV No Testimony JUD
Davis, Mary Denise OPD FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Testimony - 2024 - HB 550.pdf
JUD
Jordan, Lisae C Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault (MCASA) UNF Expungement - unit rule - house - 2024 - HB550 UNF JUD
Ahearn, Charlotte Maryland Legal Aid FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HB 550 Del. Williams MLA.pdf
JUD
Williams, Nicole Maryland General Assembly FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HB550 Testimony.pdf
JUD
Clark, Tiffany Office of the Attorney General FAV 2024-03-05 HB 550 (Support).pdf JUD
Cox, John Baltimore County States Attorneys Office, Maryland States Attorneys Association UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
HB550 - Partial Expungement.pdf
JUD
Rosen-Cohen, Nancy NCADD-Maryland FAV NCADD-MD - 2024 HB 550 FAV - Partial Expungement - JUD
Bowser, Nia Apt 220 FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
BMAC HB 550- Chapter Pres. test_ (002).pdf
JUD
Bouchat, Christopher Eric House of Delegate FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Parsons, Matt Baltimore Action Legal Team (BALT) FAV HB0550_SB0011_BALT_Testimony.pdf JUD
Mehu, Natasha Chiefs and Sheriffs Associations UNF MCPA-MSA_HB 550 Partial Expungement_Oppose.pdf JUD
Sweeney, Christopher Maryland Volunteer Lawyers Service FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HB0550 Testimony .pdf
JUD
Bates, Ivan State's Attorney for Baltimore City FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Support Letter HB550.pdf
JUD
Kahl, Catherine DPSCS INFO HB550_DPSCS_LOI.pdf JUD
Kirsch, Anne PREPARE FAV HB0550 - Support.pdf JUD
Smothers, Richard Gamma Omicron Omega Alumni Chapter FAV Chapter President GOO Iotas.pdf JUD
Kess, NaShona Maryland NAACP FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Dews, Christopher Center for Urban Families (CFUF) FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
UnitRuleRepeal_FAV_CFUF-SignOn (Public).pdf
JUD
Battle, Carlos New Shiloh Baptist Church FAV No Testimony JUD
Coleman, Harold Private Citizen FAV No Testimony JUD
Downs, Kirsten Homeless Persons Representation Project (Main Branch) FAV HPRP Written Testimony HB550 3-2024.pdf JUD
Friedman, Karen Retired Judge FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Alberts, Zachary Center for Urban Families FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
ZachAlberts_FAV-HB550.pdf
JUD
Powell, Guy Private Citizen FAV No Testimony JUD
Warnken, Heather University of Baltimore School of Law Center for Criminal Justice Reform FAV No Testimony JUD
Bridges, Kam Job Opportunities Task Force FAV No Testimony JUD
Quarles, Antoin Helping Oppressed People Excel (H.O.P.E.) FAV No Testimony JUD
Gallagher, E. Flannery University of Baltimore Law School, Center for Criminal Justice Reform FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
2024.03.01 HB 550 CCJR FAV.pdf
JUD
Bruce, Donna CFUF - Witness FAV No Testimony JUD
Banks, Pastor Cornerstone Full Gospel Church FAV No Testimony JUD
Wilkins, Jheanelle Legislative Black Caucus of MD FAV Late Testimony JUD
Delegate Williams, Delegate Williams FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Rosen-Cohen, Nancy NCADD-Maryland FAV NCADD-MD - 2024 HB 550 FAV - Partial Expungement - JPR
Spangler, Adam Office of Attorney General FAV 2024-03-26 HB550 (Support).pdf JPR
Davis, Mary Denise OPD FWA Written Testimony - 2024 - HB 550 (partial expugne JPR
Alberts, Zachary Center for Urban Families FWA HB550_JPR_FABwAmendment.pdf JPR
Gallagher, E. Flannery University of Baltimore Law School, Center for Criminal Justice Reform FWA 2024.03.25 HB 550 .pdf JPR
Emerson, Jessica The Human Trafficking Prevention Project FWA HTPP HB 550 Unit Rule Testimony (JPR)- FWA.pdf JPR
Bridges, Kam Job Opportunities Task Force FAV HB 550 - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Vendor JPR
Gally, Eric FAV HB 550 SB 11 Amendments.pdf JPR
Dews, Christopher Center for Urban Families (CFUF) FWA HB0550_FAV_CFUF_CROSSOVER.pdf JPR
Warnken, Heather University of Baltimore School of Law Center for Criminal Justice Reform FWA No Testimony JPR
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 3-26-2024 at 850 AM JPR
Click to return on the top page