Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

HB0308 - Courts – Civil Actions – Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation

Judiciary 1/15/2021 1:30:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings 3/31/2021 1:00:00 PM
As of: 11/30/2022 7:53:25 AM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Delegate Rosenberg, Delegate Rosenberg FAV No Testimony JUD
Siri, Michelle The Women's Law Center of Maryland FAV HB 308 - Courts - Civil Actions - Strategic Lawsui JUD
Jordan, Lisae C Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault (MCASA) FAV SLAP suits - house testimony - 2021.pdf JUD
Howe, Josh Compass Gov't. Relations obo MD Association for Justice (MAJ) FAV MAJ Position Paper -HB 308 - 2021 SLAPP - FAV.pdf JUD
Snyder, Rebecca FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
MDDC Support 308.pdf
JUD
Bogley, Laura Maryland Right to Life UNF HB308.Unfavorable.MDRTL.pdf JUD
McLaughlin, Jim FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HB 308 - Washington Post - SUPPORT.pdf
JUD
Sachs , Steve FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SLAPP testimony.pdf
JUD
Levy, Paul Public Citizen FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Maryland Anti-SLAPP position statement HB 308.pdf
JUD
Frosh, Brian Office of the Attorney General FAV OAGs testimony 2021-02-02 SB 162 (Support) JUD
Delegate Rosenberg, Delegate Rosenberg FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Bogley, Laura Maryland Right to Life UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
HB308.UNFAVORABLE.MDRTL.L.Bogley.Senate.pdf
JPR
Rosenberg, Samuel House of Delegates FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HB308 - Del. Rosenberg - Written Testimony for Sen
JPR
Jordan, Lisae C Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault (MCASA) FAV SLAP suits - house in senate testimony - 2021.pdf JPR
Jung, Roy Office of the Attorney General -- Legislative Affairs Unit FAV 2021-03-31 (Crossover) HB 308 (Support).pdf JPR
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 3-30-2021 at 944 AM JPR
Click to return on the top page