Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

HB0272 - Cannabis Licensing and Registration - Use of Straw Ownership - Prohibition

Economic Matters 2/23/2024 1:00:00 PM
Finance 3/26/2024 1:00:00 PM
As of: 5/20/2024 9:03:43 AM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Delegate Grammer, Delegate Grammer FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
ECM
Clark, Tiffany Office of the Attorney General FWA 2024-02-22 HB 272 (SWA).pdf ECM
Carr, Warren (Rusty) FAV No Testimony ECM
Garrison, Andrew Maryland Cannabis Administration FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
SWA - HB0272 - MCA.docx.pdf
ECM
Carrington, Darrell Carrington & Associates, LLC FAV Carrington 2024 HB 272 Cannabis Straw Owners.pdf ECM
Davis, Courtney Office of Social Equity FAV HB272 Straw Ownership - OSE Testimony.pdf ECM
Delegate Grammer, Delegate Grammer FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
FIN
Garrison, Andrew Maryland Cannabis Administration FAV FAV - HB0272 - MCA.docx (1).pdf FIN
Spangler, Adam Office of Attorney General FAV 2024-03-26 HB272 (Support with Amendments).pdf FIN
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 3-25-2024 at 826 PM FIN
Click to return on the top page