Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

HB0187 - Estates and Trusts – Administration of Estates – Fees

Judiciary 1/19/2022 1:00:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings 3/29/2022 1:00:00 PM
As of: 8/16/2022 3:45:25 PM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Delegate Terrasa, Delegate Terrasa FAV Oral Testimony JUD
Macfarlane, Byron FAV Oral Testimony
HB187 Written Testimony.pdf
JUD
Henn, Margaret Maryland Volunteer Lawyers Service FAV Oral Testimony
HB187.pdf
JUD
Cruttenden, Danielle MSBA Estate & Trust Law Section FAV MSBA E&T Section Testimony HB187.pdf JUD
Glaude', Kim FAV No Testimony JUD
Kemerer, Hannibal Office of Attorney General FAV 2022-01-16 HB 187 (Support).pdf JUD
Terrasa, Jen FAV Oral Testimony
Sponsor Testimony, HB187.pdf
JUD
Delegate Terrasa, Delegate Terrasa FAV Oral Testimony JPR
Macfarlane, Byron FAV HB187_Macfarlane_FAV.pdf JPR
Kemerer, Hannibal Office of Attorney General FAV 2022-03-28 HB 187 (Support).pdf JPR
Cruttenden, Danielle MSBA Estate & Trust Law Section FAV MSBA E&T Section Testimony HB187 as amended.pdf JPR
Terrasa, Jen FAV Sponsor Testimony, HB187, JPR.pdf JPR
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 3-29-2022 at 1015 AM JPR
Click to return on the top page