Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

HB0094 - Environment - Water Quality Revolving Loan Fund - Uses of Fund

Environment and Transportation 1/20/2021 1:30:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 3/24/2021 1:00:00 PM
As of: 10/28/2021 2:59:25 PM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Delegate Stein, Delegate Stein FAV No Testimony ENT
Kerr, Cait FAV HB 94 Environment - Water Quality Revolving Loan F ENT
Fisher, Erik FAV HB 94_CBF_SUPPORT_ErikFisher.pdf ENT
Bryer, Mark The Nature Conservancy FAV Oral Testimony ENT
Sherman, Robert American Forest Foundation FAV Oral Testimony
AFF Testimony on HB0094 - January 20 2021.pdf
ENT
abbott, tyler MDE INFO HB0094_MDE_LOI.pdf ENT
Stein, Dana FAV Stein Testimony HB 94 SUPPORT.pdf ENT
Wilson, David Audubon Maryland-DC FAV 2021Audubon testimony FOR HB0094 SRF signed.pdf ENT
Fiore, Justin Maryland Municipal League FAV HB 94_FAV_MML.pdf ENT
Stein, Dana AMENDMENT INFO HB0094-663323-01 ENT
Hoffman, Mark Chesapeake Bay Commission FAV HB 0094 Chesapeake Bay Commission Written Testimon ENT
Delegate Stein, Delegate Stein FAV Oral Testimony EHE
Lineman, Nancy Prince George's County Government FAV Prince George's County Testimony on HB 94.pdf EHE
Sherman, Robert American Forest Foundation FAV Oral Testimony
AFF Testimony on HB0094 - March 24 2021.pdf
EHE
Fisher, Erik FAV HB94_CBF_Support_ErikFisher.pdf EHE
abbott, tyler MDE INFO HB0094_MDE_LOI_Senate.pdf EHE
Kerr, Cait FAV Oral Testimony
HB 94 – Environment – Water Quality Revolving Loan
EHE
Fiore, Justin Maryland Municipal League FWA HB 94 - Water Quality Fund SENATE.pdf EHE
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 3-23-2021 at 108 PM EHE
Click to return on the top page