Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Youth -see also- Minors

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0355 /CH0217
Title
Prince George's County Board of Education - Workgroup, Alterations, and Orientation Requirement PG 503-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0383 /CH0446 (SB0438/CH0447)
Title
Young Readers Programs – Establishment (Young Readers Program Expansion Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0435
Title
Youth Sports Programs - Registrations, Personnel, and Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0459 /CH0042
Title
Juvenile Justice Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0494 (SB0127)
Title
Public Safety - Police Athletic League Grant Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0708
Title
Comprehensive Climate Solutions
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0749 /CH0470
Title
Natural Resources - Maryland Park Explorers Grant Pilot Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0766 /CH0500 (SB0656)
Title
Children – Residential Treatment Centers – Education Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0774
Title
Human Services – Universal Basic Income for Transition–Age Youth – Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0899
Title
Higher Education - Scholarship Program - Eagle Scout and Girl Scout Gold Award Recipients
Sponsor
Delegate Boteler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0986
Title
Public Schools and Youth Sports Programs – Tackle Football Season – Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1057 /CH0218
Title
Prince George's County - Recreation Blue Ribbon Workgroup PG 406-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1226
Title
Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattress Stewardship Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1235
Title
Youth Sports Safety Advisory Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1276 /CH0169 (SB0870/CH0170)
Title
Baltimore City Youth Data Hub - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0127 (HB0494)
Title
Public Safety - Police Athletic League Programs
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0282
Title
Workgroup on Screening Related to Adverse Childhood Experiences
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0438 /CH0447 (HB0383/CH0446)
Title
Young Readers Programs - Establishment (Young Readers Program Expansion Act)
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0528 /CH0038
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0656 (HB0766/CH0500)
Title
Children – Residential Treatment Centers – Education Funding
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0817 /CH0186
Title
Criminal History Records Checks - Youth Camps and Youth Development Organizations and Programs
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0852
Title
Education - School Personnel - Training
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0870 /CH0170 (HB1276/CH0169)
Title
Baltimore City Youth Data Hub - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0904
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Returning Youth Grant Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0355 /CH0217 Prince George's County Board of Education - Workgroup, Alterations, and Orientation Requirement PG 503-22 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0383 /CH0446 (SB0438/CH0447) Young Readers Programs – Establishment (Young Readers Program Expansion Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Ways and Means
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0435 Youth Sports Programs - Registrations, Personnel, and Policy Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0459 /CH0042 Juvenile Justice Reform Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 42
Judiciary
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0494 (SB0127) Public Safety - Police Athletic League Grant Fund - Establishment Delegate Jackson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0708 Comprehensive Climate Solutions Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0749 /CH0470 Natural Resources - Maryland Park Explorers Grant Pilot Program - Establishment Delegate Guyton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0766 /CH0500 (SB0656) Children – Residential Treatment Centers – Education Funding Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 500
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0774 Human Services – Universal Basic Income for Transition–Age Youth – Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0899 Higher Education - Scholarship Program - Eagle Scout and Girl Scout Gold Award Recipients Delegate Boteler 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0986 Public Schools and Youth Sports Programs – Tackle Football Season – Limitations Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 12:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2022 - 12:30 PM
HB1057 /CH0218 Prince George's County - Recreation Blue Ribbon Workgroup PG 406-22 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1226 Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattress Stewardship Program - Establishment Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
Economic Matters
HB1235 Youth Sports Safety Advisory Commission Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1276 /CH0169 (SB0870/CH0170) Baltimore City Youth Data Hub - Establishment Delegate Attar 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Ways and Means
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0127 (HB0494) Public Safety - Police Athletic League Programs Senator West 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/22/2022 - 1:40 PM
SB0282 Workgroup on Screening Related to Adverse Childhood Experiences Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0438 /CH0447 (HB0383/CH0446) Young Readers Programs - Establishment (Young Readers Program Expansion Act) Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0528 /CH0038 Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022 Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 38
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0656 (HB0766/CH0500) Children – Residential Treatment Centers – Education Funding Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0817 /CH0186 Criminal History Records Checks - Youth Camps and Youth Development Organizations and Programs Senator Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0852 Education - School Personnel - Training Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0870 /CH0170 (HB1276/CH0169) Baltimore City Youth Data Hub - Establishment Senator Washington 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0904 Maryland Higher Education Commission - Returning Youth Grant Program - Established Senator Benson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/2/2022 4:28 PM
Click to return on the top page