Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Workers' Compensation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0085 /CH0199 (SB0651/CH0200)
Title
Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0278
Title
Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Qualified Position and Revitalization Area
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0683 (SB0461)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Medical Cannabis - Compensation and Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0765
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – Novel Coronavirus (Essential Workers’ Compensation Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0876
Title
Uninsured Employers' Fund and Subsequent Injury Fund - Amount of Assessment on Awards and Settlements - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0922 /CH0421 (SB0642/CH0422)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - COVID-19-Related Death Benefits - Clarification
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0989 /CH0378 (SB0714/CH0379)
Title
Public Safety – 9–1–1 Emergency Telephone System – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1007 /CH0164 (SB0810)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Geothermal Heating and Cooling Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1199 (SB0813)
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – COVID–19
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0461 (HB0683)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Medical Cannabis - Compensation and Benefits
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0642 /CH0422 (HB0922/CH0421)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - COVID-19-Related Death Benefits - Clarification
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0651 /CH0200 (HB0085/CH0199)
Title
Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0714 /CH0379 (HB0989/CH0378)
Title
Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0756
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – COVID–19
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0810 (HB1007/CH0164)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Geothermal Heating and Cooling Systems
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0812
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0813 (HB1199)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0860
Title
Workers' Compensation - COVID-19 Occupational Disease Presumption - Public School Employees
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0951
Title
Labor and Employment – Workers’ Compensation Claims – Fees for Legal Services
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0085 /CH0199 (SB0651/CH0200) Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers Delegate Bhandari 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Economic Matters
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0278 Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Qualified Position and Revitalization Area Delegate Feldmark 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Ways and Means
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0683 (SB0461) Workers' Compensation - Medical Cannabis - Compensation and Benefits Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0765 Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – Novel Coronavirus (Essential Workers’ Compensation Act) Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB0876 Uninsured Employers' Fund and Subsequent Injury Fund - Amount of Assessment on Awards and Settlements - Sunset Extension Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0922 /CH0421 (SB0642/CH0422) State Retirement and Pension System - COVID-19-Related Death Benefits - Clarification Delegate Lierman 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 421
Appropriations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0989 /CH0378 (SB0714/CH0379) Public Safety – 9–1–1 Emergency Telephone System – Alterations Delegate Krebs 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 378
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1007 /CH0164 (SB0810) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Geothermal Heating and Cooling Systems Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 164
Economic Matters
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1199 (SB0813) Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – COVID–19 Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0461 (HB0683) Workers' Compensation - Medical Cannabis - Compensation and Benefits Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/18/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0642 /CH0422 (HB0922/CH0421) State Retirement and Pension System - COVID-19-Related Death Benefits - Clarification Senator Elfreth 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 422
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2021 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
SB0651 /CH0200 (HB0085/CH0199) Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0714 /CH0379 (HB0989/CH0378) Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - Alterations Senator Kagan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 379
Finance
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0756 Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – COVID–19 Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0810 (HB1007/CH0164) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Geothermal Heating and Cooling Systems Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0812 Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19 Senator Klausmeier 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0813 (HB1199) Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19 Senator Klausmeier 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0860 Workers' Compensation - COVID-19 Occupational Disease Presumption - Public School Employees Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0951 Labor and Employment – Workers’ Compensation Claims – Fees for Legal Services Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:19 AM
Click to return on the top page