Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Women -see also- Gender

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0037
Title
Services for Formerly Incarcerated Women - Commission and Pilot Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0050
Title
Commission on History, Culture, and Civics in Education
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0163 (SB0056)
Title
Food Waste and Solid Waste Reduction - Grants, Fund, and Surcharge
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0191 (SB0071)
Title
Correctional Services - Pregnancy and Postpartum Support (Prevention of Forced Infant Separation Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Mireku-North
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0253 /CH0241
Title
Cannabis Reform - Alterations
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0657
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0864 /CH0539
Title
Energy Efficiency and Conservation Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0965
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Breast Cancer Program - Eligibility and Public Awareness Campaign
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1051 /CH0799 (SB1059/CH0798)
Title
Maternal Health – Assessments, Referrals, and Reporting (Maryland Maternal Health Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate White Holland
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1077
Title
Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs – Small Business Climate Change Coordinator – Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1159
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Veterans' and Fraternal Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1184 (SB0154)
Title
State Procurement - Preferences - Historically Underutilized Business Zone Businesses
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1355
Title
Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattress Stewardship Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0056 (HB0163)
Title
Food Waste and Solid Waste Reduction – Grants, Fund, and Surcharge
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0071 (HB0191)
Title
Correctional Services - Pregnancy and Postpartum Support (Prevention of Forced Infant Separation Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154 (HB1184)
Title
State Procurement - Preferences - Historically Underutilized Business Zone Businesses
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0570 /CH0563 (HB0397/CH0564)
Title
Public Utilities - Thermal Energy Network Systems - Authorization and Establishment (Working for Accessible Renewable Maryland Thermal Heat (WARMTH) Act)
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0673 /CH0582 (HB0962/CH0583)
Title
State Procurement - Small Business Reserve Program - Goals and Outreach Program
Sponsor
Senator Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0980
Title
Education - Computer Science - Content Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1013
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Veterans' and Fraternal Organizations
Sponsor
Senator Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1059 /CH0798 (HB1051/CH0799)
Title
Maternal Health – Assessments, Referrals, and Reporting (Maryland Maternal Health Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0037 Services for Formerly Incarcerated Women - Commission and Pilot Program - Establishment Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0050 Commission on History, Culture, and Civics in Education Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/17/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0163 (SB0056) Food Waste and Solid Waste Reduction - Grants, Fund, and Surcharge Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0191 (SB0071) Correctional Services - Pregnancy and Postpartum Support (Prevention of Forced Infant Separation Act) Delegate Mireku-North 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0253 /CH0241 Cannabis Reform - Alterations Chair, Economic Matters Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Economic Matters
2/23/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0657 Public Institutions of Higher Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policy Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/27/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB0864 /CH0539 Energy Efficiency and Conservation Plans Delegate Crosby 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 539
Economic Matters
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0965 Maryland Department of Health - Breast Cancer Program - Eligibility and Public Awareness Campaign Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1051 /CH0799 (SB1059/CH0798) Maternal Health – Assessments, Referrals, and Reporting (Maryland Maternal Health Act of 2024) Delegate White Holland 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 799
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1077 Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs – Small Business Climate Change Coordinator – Establishment Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1159 State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Veterans' and Fraternal Organizations Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1184 (SB0154) State Procurement - Preferences - Historically Underutilized Business Zone Businesses Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1355 Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattress Stewardship Program - Establishment Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0056 (HB0163) Food Waste and Solid Waste Reduction – Grants, Fund, and Surcharge Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0071 (HB0191) Correctional Services - Pregnancy and Postpartum Support (Prevention of Forced Infant Separation Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0154 (HB1184) State Procurement - Preferences - Historically Underutilized Business Zone Businesses Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2024 - 12:00 PM
SB0570 /CH0563 (HB0397/CH0564) Public Utilities - Thermal Energy Network Systems - Authorization and Establishment (Working for Accessible Renewable Maryland Thermal Heat (WARMTH) Act) Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0673 /CH0582 (HB0962/CH0583) State Procurement - Small Business Reserve Program - Goals and Outreach Program Senator Charles 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 582
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0980 Education - Computer Science - Content Standards and Requirements Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1013 State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Veterans' and Fraternal Organizations Senator Charles 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1059 /CH0798 (HB1051/CH0799) Maternal Health – Assessments, Referrals, and Reporting (Maryland Maternal Health Act of 2024) Senator Ellis 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 798
Finance
3/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2024 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:39 PM
Click to return on the top page