Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Witnesses

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0099
Title
Election Law – Absentee Ballots – Signature Requirements and Verification
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0210 /CH0486
Title
Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0284 /CH0161 (SB0020/CH0162)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Out of Court Statements - Child Victims and Witnesses
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0402 (SB0221)
Title
Department of the Environment - Enforcement Authority
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0496
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0576 /CH0176 (SB0036/CH0177)
Title
Wills and Trust Instruments – Electronic Execution
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0663 /CH0714 (SB0317/CH0715)
Title
State Government – Notarial Acts – Fees and Use of Communication Technology
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0863
Title
Courts - Expert Witnesses - Letter of Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0991 (SB0441)
Title
Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board and Police Accountability Board
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1017 (SB0807)
Title
Frederick County – Mental Health Law – Assisted Outpatient Treatment Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1046 (SB0762)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1099
Title
State Personnel - Whistleblower Law - Procedures and Remedies (First Amendment and Public Employee Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1177
Title
Courts - Expert Witnesses - Licensed Certified Social Workers-Clinical
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1353
Title
Omnibus Procurement Reform Act ("OPRA") of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1429 (SB0763/CH0141)
Title
Collection and Publication of Criminal Case and Prosecutorial Information
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0020 /CH0162 (HB0284/CH0161)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Out of Court Statements - Child Victims and Witnesses
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0036 /CH0177 (HB0576/CH0176)
Title
Wills and Trust Instruments – Electronic Execution
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0207 /CH0231
Title
Insurance Carriers and Managed Care Organizations - Cybersecurity Standards
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0221 (HB0402)
Title
Department of the Environment – Enforcement Authority
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0317 /CH0715 (HB0663/CH0714)
Title
State Government – Notarial Acts – Fees and Use of Communication Technology
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0762 (HB1046)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0763 /CH0141 (HB1429)
Title
Public Safety and Criminal Justice - Transparency and Accountability
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0807 (HB1017)
Title
Frederick County – Mental Health Law – Assisted Outpatient Treatment Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0099 Election Law – Absentee Ballots – Signature Requirements and Verification Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0210 /CH0486 Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception Delegate Grammer 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 486
Judiciary
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0284 /CH0161 (SB0020/CH0162) Criminal Procedure - Out of Court Statements - Child Victims and Witnesses Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Judiciary
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0402 (SB0221) Department of the Environment - Enforcement Authority Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0496 Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act 2022) Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0576 /CH0176 (SB0036/CH0177) Wills and Trust Instruments – Electronic Execution Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176
Judiciary
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0663 /CH0714 (SB0317/CH0715) State Government – Notarial Acts – Fees and Use of Communication Technology Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 714
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0863 Courts - Expert Witnesses - Letter of Exception Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0991 (SB0441) Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board and Police Accountability Board Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1017 (SB0807) Frederick County – Mental Health Law – Assisted Outpatient Treatment Pilot Program Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2022 - 3:00 PM
HB1046 (SB0762) Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1099 State Personnel - Whistleblower Law - Procedures and Remedies (First Amendment and Public Employee Protection Act) Delegate Bagnall 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1177 Courts - Expert Witnesses - Licensed Certified Social Workers-Clinical Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1353 Omnibus Procurement Reform Act ("OPRA") of 2022 Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1429 (SB0763/CH0141) Collection and Publication of Criminal Case and Prosecutorial Information Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0020 /CH0162 (HB0284/CH0161) Criminal Procedure - Out of Court Statements - Child Victims and Witnesses Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 162
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0036 /CH0177 (HB0576/CH0176) Wills and Trust Instruments – Electronic Execution Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2022 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0207 /CH0231 Insurance Carriers and Managed Care Organizations - Cybersecurity Standards Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Finance
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0221 (HB0402) Department of the Environment – Enforcement Authority President 6 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0317 /CH0715 (HB0663/CH0714) State Government – Notarial Acts – Fees and Use of Communication Technology Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 715
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0762 (HB1046) Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0763 /CH0141 (HB1429) Public Safety and Criminal Justice - Transparency and Accountability Senator Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0807 (HB1017) Frederick County – Mental Health Law – Assisted Outpatient Treatment Pilot Program Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 4:52 PM
Click to return on the top page