Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Wind Energy

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0569 (SB0418)
Title
Energy Generation, Transmission, and Storage Projects - Required Community Benefit Agreement and Labor Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0622 (SB0526/CH0578)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Renewable Energy Credits - Offshore Wind
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0418 (HB0569)
Title
Energy Generation Projects - Required Community Benefit Agreement and Labor Standards
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0526 /CH0578 (HB0622)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Renewable Energy Credits - Offshore Wind
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0528 /CH0038
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0616
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard – Eligible Sources – Waste–to–Energy and Refuse–Derived Fuel
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0569 (SB0418) Energy Generation, Transmission, and Storage Projects - Required Community Benefit Agreement and Labor Standards Delegate Carey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0622 (SB0526/CH0578) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Renewable Energy Credits - Offshore Wind Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Economic Matters
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0418 (HB0569) Energy Generation Projects - Required Community Benefit Agreement and Labor Standards Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0526 /CH0578 (HB0622) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Renewable Energy Credits - Offshore Wind Senator Feldman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 578
Finance
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0528 /CH0038 Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022 Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 38
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0616 Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard – Eligible Sources – Waste–to–Energy and Refuse–Derived Fuel Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:15 PM
Click to return on the top page