Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Wind Energy

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0220 (SB0053)
Title
Clean Energy Attribute Credits and Procurement
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0332
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Eligible Sources
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0376 /CH0174 (SB0153/CH0175)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard – Municipal Electric Utilities
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0419 (SB0460)
Title
Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1362
Title
Clean and Renewable Energy Standard (CARES)
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0053 (HB0220)
Title
Clean Energy Attribute Credits and Procurement
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0153 /CH0175 (HB0376/CH0174)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Municipal Electric Utilities
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0460 (HB0419)
Title
Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0220 (SB0053) Clean Energy Attribute Credits and Procurement Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0332 Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Eligible Sources Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0376 /CH0174 (SB0153/CH0175) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard – Municipal Electric Utilities Delegate Mautz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Economic Matters
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0419 (SB0460) Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives Delegate Qi 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Economic Matters
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1362 Clean and Renewable Energy Standard (CARES) Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0053 (HB0220) Clean Energy Attribute Credits and Procurement Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0153 /CH0175 (HB0376/CH0174) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Municipal Electric Utilities Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Finance
1/21/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0460 (HB0419) Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives Senator Feldman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Finance
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/1/2021 3:43 PM
Click to return on the top page