Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Wildlands

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1270 (SB0399)
Title
Natural Resources - Wildland Areas - Overhead Transmission Lines
Sponsor
Delegate Hinebaugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0399 (HB1270)
Title
Natural Resources - Wildland Areas - Overhead Transmission Lines
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0968
Title
Howard County - Patuxent River Wildland - Use of Mechanical or Motorized Equipment Ho. Co. 5-25
Sponsor
Howard County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1270 (SB0399) Natural Resources - Wildland Areas - Overhead Transmission Lines Delegate Hinebaugh 2 2 In the House - Special Order until 03/27 (Delegate Crosby) Adopted
Economic Matters
3/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0399 (HB1270) Natural Resources - Wildland Areas - Overhead Transmission Lines Senator McKay 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0968 Howard County - Patuxent River Wildland - Use of Mechanical or Motorized Equipment Ho. Co. 5-25 Howard County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/8/2025 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page