Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Wildlands

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0653 /CH0237 (SB0348/CH0238)
Title
Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0882 /CH0089
Title
Natural Resources – Pocomoke River Wildland – Alteration of Boundaries
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0884 /CH0339
Title
State Conservation Land - Old-Growth Forests - Management
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1312 /CH0244 (SB0814/CH0245)
Title
Public Safety – Resilient Maryland Revolving Loan Fund – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0348 /CH0238 (HB0653/CH0237)
Title
Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0814 /CH0245 (HB1312/CH0244)
Title
Public Safety - Resilient Maryland Revolving Loan Fund - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0653 /CH0237 (SB0348/CH0238) Conservation Finance Act Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0882 /CH0089 Natural Resources – Pocomoke River Wildland – Alteration of Boundaries Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0884 /CH0339 State Conservation Land - Old-Growth Forests - Management Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1312 /CH0244 (SB0814/CH0245) Public Safety – Resilient Maryland Revolving Loan Fund – Alterations Delegate Watson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0348 /CH0238 (HB0653/CH0237) Conservation Finance Act Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
SB0814 /CH0245 (HB1312/CH0244) Public Safety - Resilient Maryland Revolving Loan Fund - Alterations Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2022 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 1:48 PM
Click to return on the top page