Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Wicomico County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0439 (SB0470)
Title
Institute for Innovation and Implementation - Pregnant, Expecting, and Parenting Students - Data Collection and Report
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0795 /CH0549 (SB0715/CH0550)
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Alterations
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1179 /CH0715 (SB0794/CH0716)
Title
Wicomico County - Property Tax Credit - Hotel or Residential Development
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1359
Title
Wicomico County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class A Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154 (HB0018/CH0746)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Tenants - Access to Counsel
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0470 (HB0439)
Title
Institute for Innovation and Implementation - Pregnant, Expecting, and Parenting Students - Data Collection and Report
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0715 /CH0550 (HB0795/CH0549)
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0794 /CH0716 (HB1179/CH0715)
Title
Wicomico County - Property Tax Credit - Hotel or Residential Development
Sponsor
Wicomico County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0950
Title
Wicomico County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class A Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses – Hours
Sponsor
Wicomico County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0439 (SB0470) Institute for Innovation and Implementation - Pregnant, Expecting, and Parenting Students - Data Collection and Report Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0795 /CH0549 (SB0715/CH0550) Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Alterations Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 549
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1179 /CH0715 (SB0794/CH0716) Wicomico County - Property Tax Credit - Hotel or Residential Development Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 715
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1359 Wicomico County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class A Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0154 (HB0018/CH0746) Landlord and Tenant - Residential Tenants - Access to Counsel Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0470 (HB0439) Institute for Innovation and Implementation - Pregnant, Expecting, and Parenting Students - Data Collection and Report Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0715 /CH0550 (HB0795/CH0549) Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Alterations Senator Carozza 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 550
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0794 /CH0716 (HB1179/CH0715) Wicomico County - Property Tax Credit - Hotel or Residential Development Wicomico County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 716
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0950 Wicomico County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class A Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses – Hours Wicomico County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:19 PM
Click to return on the top page