Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Wetlands

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0149
Title
Wetlands and Waterways – Riparian Rights – Voluntary Registry and Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0171 (SB0135)
Title
Climate Crisis and Environmental Justice Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0653 /CH0237 (SB0348/CH0238)
Title
Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0869 /CH0465 (SB0945)
Title
Wetlands and Waterways Program Division - Permitting for Ecological Restoration Projects - Required Study
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0135 (HB0171)
Title
Climate Crisis and Environmental Justice Act
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0348 /CH0238 (HB0653/CH0237)
Title
Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0945 (HB0869/CH0465)
Title
Wetlands and Waterways Program Division - Permitting for Ecological Restoration Projects - Required Study
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0149 Wetlands and Waterways – Riparian Rights – Voluntary Registry and Notice Delegate Bagnall 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0171 (SB0135) Climate Crisis and Environmental Justice Act Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0653 /CH0237 (SB0348/CH0238) Conservation Finance Act Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0869 /CH0465 (SB0945) Wetlands and Waterways Program Division - Permitting for Ecological Restoration Projects - Required Study Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0135 (HB0171) Climate Crisis and Environmental Justice Act Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0348 /CH0238 (HB0653/CH0237) Conservation Finance Act Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
SB0945 (HB0869/CH0465) Wetlands and Waterways Program Division - Permitting for Ecological Restoration Projects - Required Study Senator Gallion 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 3:15 PM
Click to return on the top page