Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Wells -see also- Hydraulic Fracturing; Water

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0559 (SB0544)
Title
Food Establishments - Portable Chemical Toilets
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan, T.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1124 (SB0964)
Title
Dorchester County - Well and On-Site Sewage Disposal Activities - Privatization Program
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1296 (SB0930)
Title
Environment - Managed Aquifer Recharge Pilot Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Pruski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0250
Title
Department of the Environment - Fees, Penalties, Funding, and Regulation
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0544 (HB0559)
Title
Food Establishments - Portable Chemical Toilets
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0930 (HB1296)
Title
Environment - Managed Aquifer Recharge Pilot Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0964 (HB1124)
Title
Dorchester County - Well and On-Site Sewage Disposal Activities - Privatization Program
Sponsor
Dorchester County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0559 (SB0544) Food Establishments - Portable Chemical Toilets Delegate Morgan, T. 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Economic Matters
2/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1124 (SB0964) Dorchester County - Well and On-Site Sewage Disposal Activities - Privatization Program Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1296 (SB0930) Environment - Managed Aquifer Recharge Pilot Program - Establishment Delegate Pruski 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB0250 Department of the Environment - Fees, Penalties, Funding, and Regulation Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0544 (HB0559) Food Establishments - Portable Chemical Toilets Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/28/2025 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0930 (HB1296) Environment - Managed Aquifer Recharge Pilot Program - Establishment Senator Gile 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0964 (HB1124) Dorchester County - Well and On-Site Sewage Disposal Activities - Privatization Program Dorchester County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/15/2025 1:33 PM
Click to return on the top page