Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Weather

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0128 (SB0149)
Title
Climate Change Adaptation and Mitigation - Total Assessed Cost of Greenhouse Gas Emissions - Study and Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0340
Title
Climate Change - Attorney General Actions, Climate Change Restitution Fund, and Climate Change Restitution Fund Advisory Council
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1041
Title
Homeowners Associations - Reserve Funding Requirements - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Roberts
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1081 (SB0709)
Title
Criminal Law - Masked Intimidation - Prohibition (Unmask Hate Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Boafo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1164
Title
Counties and Municipalities - Homelessness - Local Laws (Right to Rest Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1348
Title
Home Improvement Contractors - Disaster Mitigating Services - Regulation and Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0149 (HB0128)
Title
Climate Change Adaptation and Mitigation - Total Assessed Cost of Greenhouse Gas Emissions - Study and Reports
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0709 (HB1081)
Title
Criminal Law - Masked Intimidation - Prohibition (Unmask Hate Act)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0893
Title
Insurance - Enforcement, Impaired Entities, Homeowner's Insurance Policies, and Unfair Claim Settlement Practices - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0128 (SB0149) Climate Change Adaptation and Mitigation - Total Assessed Cost of Greenhouse Gas Emissions - Study and Reports Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Economic Matters
1/23/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Education, Energy, and the Environment
Finance
HB0340 Climate Change - Attorney General Actions, Climate Change Restitution Fund, and Climate Change Restitution Fund Advisory Council Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1041 Homeowners Associations - Reserve Funding Requirements - Exemption Delegate Roberts 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1081 (SB0709) Criminal Law - Masked Intimidation - Prohibition (Unmask Hate Act) Delegate Boafo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2025 - 11:00 AM
HB1164 Counties and Municipalities - Homelessness - Local Laws (Right to Rest Act) Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1348 Home Improvement Contractors - Disaster Mitigating Services - Regulation and Prohibition Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 11:00 a.m.
Economic Matters
3/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
4/07/2025 - 11:00 AM
SB0149 (HB0128) Climate Change Adaptation and Mitigation - Total Assessed Cost of Greenhouse Gas Emissions - Study and Reports Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/13/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Economic Matters
Environment and Transportation
SB0709 (HB1081) Criminal Law - Masked Intimidation - Prohibition (Unmask Hate Act) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0893 Insurance - Enforcement, Impaired Entities, Homeowner's Insurance Policies, and Unfair Claim Settlement Practices - Revisions Senator Charles 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/05/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/7/2025 9:10 PM
Click to return on the top page