Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Weapons -see also- Guns

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0338 /CH0809 (SB0182/CH0808)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Facial Recognition Technology – Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0814 /CH0735 (SB0744)
Title
Juvenile Law - Reform
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1144 (SB1085)
Title
Corrections - Segregated Housing - Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Phillips
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1167 /CH0293 (SB1090)
Title
Maryland Center for School Safety - Secure Schools Emergency Response Grant Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Foley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1390 /CH0354
Title
Public Schools - Public School Construction - Funding and Administration
Sponsor
Delegate Harris
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1437
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Crime Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0003 (SJ0002)
Title
Use of Nuclear Weapons
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0182 /CH0808 (HB0338/CH0809)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0744 (HB0814/CH0735)
Title
Juvenile Law - Reform
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0756
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - School Safety and Student Well-Being - Examination of Policies and Funding
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1085 (HB1144)
Title
Corrections - Segregated Housing - Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1090 (HB1167/CH0293)
Title
Maryland Center for School Safety - Secure Schools Emergency Response Grant Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0002 (HJ0003)
Title
Use of Nuclear Weapons
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0338 /CH0809 (SB0182/CH0808) Criminal Procedure – Facial Recognition Technology – Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions Delegate Moon 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 809
Judiciary
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0814 /CH0735 (SB0744) Juvenile Law - Reform Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 735
Judiciary
2/08/2024 - 12:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1144 (SB1085) Corrections - Segregated Housing - Limitations Delegate Phillips 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1167 /CH0293 (SB1090) Maryland Center for School Safety - Secure Schools Emergency Response Grant Program - Established Delegate Foley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293
Ways and Means
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1390 /CH0354 Public Schools - Public School Construction - Funding and Administration Delegate Harris 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Appropriations
2/27/2024 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB1437 Juvenile Law - Juvenile Crime Reform Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HJ0003 (SJ0002) Use of Nuclear Weapons Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0182 /CH0808 (HB0338/CH0809) Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions Senator Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 808
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0744 (HB0814/CH0735) Juvenile Law - Reform President 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2024 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0756 Primary and Secondary Education - School Safety and Student Well-Being - Examination of Policies and Funding Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB1085 (HB1144) Corrections - Segregated Housing - Limitations Senator Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1090 (HB1167/CH0293) Maryland Center for School Safety - Secure Schools Emergency Response Grant Program - Established Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SJ0002 (HJ0003) Use of Nuclear Weapons Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/08/2024 - 9:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:40 PM
Click to return on the top page