Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Weapons -see also- Guns

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0175
Title
Public Safety - Ammunition - Sales and Transfers
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0295 (SB0227)
Title
Water Pollution - Stormwater Management Regulations and Watershed Implementation Plans - Review and Update
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0956
Title
Criminal Procedure - Law Enforcement Procedures - Use of Force
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1035
Title
State Government – Attorney General – Independent Law Enforcement Prosecution Unit
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1236
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Violent Crimes Special Prosecution Unit for Baltimore City
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0419
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Search Warrants
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0599
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Surplus Military Equipment
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0175 Public Safety - Ammunition - Sales and Transfers Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
3/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0295 (SB0227) Water Pollution - Stormwater Management Regulations and Watershed Implementation Plans - Review and Update Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0581 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0956 Criminal Procedure - Law Enforcement Procedures - Use of Force Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1035 State Government – Attorney General – Independent Law Enforcement Prosecution Unit Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1236 Office of the Attorney General - Violent Crimes Special Prosecution Unit for Baltimore City Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0419 Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Search Warrants Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0486 (HB0581) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0599 Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Surplus Military Equipment Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 8:05 PM
Click to return on the top page