Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Water Pollution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0076 /CH0618 (SB0334/CH0619)
Title
Water Pollution Control – Intervention in Civil Actions – Rights and Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0077
Title
Environment - Driveway Sealers - Prohibitions (Safer Sealant Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0111
Title
Environmental Justice - At-Risk Communities and Environmental Permits - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0204 /CH0442 (SB0324/CH0443)
Title
Environment and Natural Resources - Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement - Information Maintenance and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0295 /CH0640 (SB0227/CH0641)
Title
Water Pollution - Stormwater Management Regulations and Watershed Implementation Plans - Review and Update
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0427 (SB0540)
Title
Federal Clean Water Act - Authority of State
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0458
Title
Program Open Space - Local Projects - Visitor Behavior Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0227 /CH0641 (HB0295/CH0640)
Title
Water Pollution - Stormwater Management Regulations and Watershed Implementation Plans - Review and Update
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0324 /CH0443 (HB0204/CH0442)
Title
Environment and Natural Resources – Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement – Information Maintenance and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0334 /CH0619 (HB0076/CH0618)
Title
Water Pollution Control - Intervention in Civil Actions - Rights and Authority
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0540 (HB0427)
Title
Federal Clean Water Act - Authority of State
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0076 /CH0618 (SB0334/CH0619) Water Pollution Control – Intervention in Civil Actions – Rights and Authority Delegate Love 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 618
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0077 Environment - Driveway Sealers - Prohibitions (Safer Sealant Act of 2021) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - Laid Over (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0111 Environmental Justice - At-Risk Communities and Environmental Permits - Requirements Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0204 /CH0442 (SB0324/CH0443) Environment and Natural Resources - Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement - Information Maintenance and Reporting Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 442
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0295 /CH0640 (SB0227/CH0641) Water Pollution - Stormwater Management Regulations and Watershed Implementation Plans - Review and Update Delegate Love 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 640
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0427 (SB0540) Federal Clean Water Act - Authority of State Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0458 Program Open Space - Local Projects - Visitor Behavior Policies Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0227 /CH0641 (HB0295/CH0640) Water Pollution - Stormwater Management Regulations and Watershed Implementation Plans - Review and Update Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 641
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0324 /CH0443 (HB0204/CH0442) Environment and Natural Resources – Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement – Information Maintenance and Reporting Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 443
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0334 /CH0619 (HB0076/CH0618) Water Pollution Control - Intervention in Civil Actions - Rights and Authority Senator Carter 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 619
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
SB0540 (HB0427) Federal Clean Water Act - Authority of State Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:17 PM
Click to return on the top page