Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Washington Suburban Sanitary District

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0399 /CH0612
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Minority Business Enterprise Utilization Program - Termination Extension PG/MC 105-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0400 /CH0457
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Hiring and Promotion Preferences - Veterans and Their Spouses PG/MC 106-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0526 /CH0598
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Plumbing and Fuel Gas Services - Licenses and Penalties PG/MC 109-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1059 /CH0284
Title
Bicounty Commissions - Ethics - Certification of Compliance PG/MC 103-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0399 /CH0612 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Minority Business Enterprise Utilization Program - Termination Extension PG/MC 105-22 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 612
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2022 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0400 /CH0457 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Hiring and Promotion Preferences - Veterans and Their Spouses PG/MC 106-22 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0526 /CH0598 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Plumbing and Fuel Gas Services - Licenses and Penalties PG/MC 109-22 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 598
Economic Matters
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1059 /CH0284 Bicounty Commissions - Ethics - Certification of Compliance PG/MC 103-22 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:14 PM
Click to return on the top page