Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Washington County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0870 (SB0836)
Title
Washington County - Abandoned Cemetery - Acquisition and Disposition
Sponsor
Delegate Grossman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0920 /CH1024 (SB0853/CH1025)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0921 (SB0855)
Title
Washington County – Board of License Commissioners and Board of Community College Trustees – Membership
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0928 /CH0701
Title
Washington County - Procurement - Vehicles
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0967 /CH0700
Title
Town of Keedysville - Parking of Vehicles - Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0971 /CH0219 (SB0851)
Title
Washington County - Interscholastic Athletics - Student Eligibility Waiver and School Classification
Sponsor
Delegate Grossman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0995 /CH0367 (SB0852/CH0368)
Title
Washington County Board of Education - Members - Residency Requirement
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1018
Title
Manufacturing Business Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1021 /CH0702
Title
Washington County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1378 (SB1078)
Title
Task Force on Washington County Regional Water and Wastewater Governance
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1480 (SB0611)
Title
Frederick and Washington Counties - Bow Hunting - Openly Carrying Handguns
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0248 /CH0056 (HB0825/CH0055)
Title
Libraries - Regional Resource Centers - Governing Board Membership
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0611 (HB1480)
Title
Frederick and Washington Counties – Bow Hunting – Openly Carrying Handguns
Sponsor
Senator Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0836 (HB0870)
Title
Washington County - Abandoned Cemetery - Acquisition and Disposition
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0849
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act - Hagerstown Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility, Inc.
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0852 /CH0368 (HB0995/CH0367)
Title
Washington County Board of Education - Members - Residency Requirement
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0853 /CH1025 (HB0920/CH1024)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0855 (HB0921)
Title
Washington County - Board of License Commissioners - Membership
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0966 /CH0722
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1078 (HB1378)
Title
Task Force on Washington County Regional Water and Wastewater Governance
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0870 (SB0836) Washington County - Abandoned Cemetery - Acquisition and Disposition Delegate Grossman 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0920 /CH1024 (SB0853/CH1025) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility Beer, Wine, and Liquor License Washington County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1024
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0921 (SB0855) Washington County – Board of License Commissioners and Board of Community College Trustees – Membership Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m.
Appropriations
3/05/2024 - 12:30 PM
HB0928 /CH0701 Washington County - Procurement - Vehicles Washington County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 701
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB0967 /CH0700 Town of Keedysville - Parking of Vehicles - Restrictions Delegate Wivell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 700
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0971 /CH0219 (SB0851) Washington County - Interscholastic Athletics - Student Eligibility Waiver and School Classification Delegate Grossman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
Ways and Means
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0995 /CH0367 (SB0852/CH0368) Washington County Board of Education - Members - Residency Requirement Washington County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 367
Ways and Means
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1018 Manufacturing Business Personal Property Tax - Exemption Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1021 /CH0702 Washington County - Public Facilities Bonds Washington County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 702
Appropriations
3/07/2024 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB1378 (SB1078) Task Force on Washington County Regional Water and Wastewater Governance Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1480 (SB0611) Frederick and Washington Counties - Bow Hunting - Openly Carrying Handguns Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0248 /CH0056 (HB0825/CH0055) Libraries - Regional Resource Centers - Governing Board Membership Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 56
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/17/2024 - 3:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0611 (HB1480) Frederick and Washington Counties – Bow Hunting – Openly Carrying Handguns Senator Folden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0836 (HB0870) Washington County - Abandoned Cemetery - Acquisition and Disposition Senator McKay 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0849 Local Government Tort Claims Act - Hagerstown Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility, Inc. Senator Corderman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 2:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2024 - 2:30 PM
SB0852 /CH0368 (HB0995/CH0367) Washington County Board of Education - Members - Residency Requirement Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0853 /CH1025 (HB0920/CH1024) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility Beer, Wine, and Liquor License Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1025
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0855 (HB0921) Washington County - Board of License Commissioners - Membership Washington County Senators 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
Appropriations
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0966 /CH0722 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 722
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB1078 (HB1378) Task Force on Washington County Regional Water and Wastewater Governance Washington County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Energy, and the Environment
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:51 PM
Click to return on the top page