Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Warrants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0211
Title
Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrest - Straw Purchase Participant
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0271
Title
Clerks of the Courts - Case Management System - Information
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0532
Title
Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0545
Title
Public Safety - Persistent Aerial Surveillance
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0651
Title
Criminal Procedure – No–Knock Search Warrants – Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1046 (SB0762)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1064 (SB0816)
Title
Real Property - Actions for Possession - Pet Protections
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Testing - Warrants and Authorized Police Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1442 (SB0710)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Expungement of Records – Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0347
Title
Anne Arundel County - Landlord and Tenant - Procedures for Failure to Pay Rent
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0585 /CH0174
Title
Public Safety - Warrants and Absconding
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0710 (HB1442)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0762 (HB1046)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0211 Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrest - Straw Purchase Participant Delegate Attar 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0271 Clerks of the Courts - Case Management System - Information Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0532 Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0545 Public Safety - Persistent Aerial Surveillance Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0651 Criminal Procedure – No–Knock Search Warrants – Repeal Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1046 (SB0762) Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1064 (SB0816) Real Property - Actions for Possession - Pet Protections Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1385 Drunk and Drugged Driving - Testing - Warrants and Authorized Police Officers Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1442 (SB0710) Criminal Procedure – Expungement of Records – Modifications Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0347 Anne Arundel County - Landlord and Tenant - Procedures for Failure to Pay Rent Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0585 /CH0174 Public Safety - Warrants and Absconding Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0710 (HB1442) Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Modifications Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0762 (HB1046) Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:15 AM
Click to return on the top page