Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Vulnerable Adults -see also- Developmental Disabilities; Eld

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0118 /CH0165 (SB0293/CH0166)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0321 /CH0223 (SB0061/CH0224)
Title
Public Buildings - Changing Facilities - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0347
Title
Criminal Law - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult or Elderly Individual - Undue Influence
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0816
Title
Family Law - Support of Destitute Adult Children - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0836 (SB0741)
Title
COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0903
Title
Task Force to Study the Maryland Public Guardianship Program
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0983 /CH0789
Title
Nursing Homes - COVID-19 and Other Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Visitation (The Gloria Daytz Lewis Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1000 /CH0511
Title
Estates and Trusts - Guardian of Property of Minor or Disabled Person - Prohibition on Distribution or Disbursement
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1122 (SB0776)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Out of Court Statements – Child and Vulnerable Adult Victims
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1281 (SB0844)
Title
Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0061 /CH0224 (HB0321/CH0223)
Title
Public Buildings – Changing Facilities – Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0293 /CH0166 (HB0118/CH0165)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0327 /CH0311
Title
Civil Actions - Financial Exploitation of Susceptible Adults and Older Adults (Maryland SAFE Act)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0419
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Search Warrants
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0690
Title
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0741 (HB0836)
Title
COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0776 (HB1122)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Out of Court Statements – Child and Vulnerable Adult Victims
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0844 (HB1281)
Title
Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0118 /CH0165 (SB0293/CH0166) Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Environment and Transportation
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0321 /CH0223 (SB0061/CH0224) Public Buildings - Changing Facilities - Requirements Delegate Ebersole 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Health and Government Operations
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0347 Criminal Law - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult or Elderly Individual - Undue Influence Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 12:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2021 - 12:30 PM
HB0534 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0816 Family Law - Support of Destitute Adult Children - Repeal Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0836 (SB0741) COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021 Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Finance
HB0903 Task Force to Study the Maryland Public Guardianship Program Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0983 /CH0789 Nursing Homes - COVID-19 and Other Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Visitation (The Gloria Daytz Lewis Act) Delegate Lehman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 789
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1000 /CH0511 Estates and Trusts - Guardian of Property of Minor or Disabled Person - Prohibition on Distribution or Disbursement Delegate Pippy 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 511
Judiciary
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1122 (SB0776) Criminal Procedure – Out of Court Statements – Child and Vulnerable Adult Victims Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1281 (SB0844) Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0061 /CH0224 (HB0321/CH0223) Public Buildings – Changing Facilities – Requirements Senator Lam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
SB0293 /CH0166 (HB0118/CH0165) Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0327 /CH0311 Civil Actions - Financial Exploitation of Susceptible Adults and Older Adults (Maryland SAFE Act) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0419 Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Search Warrants Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0690 Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0741 (HB0836) COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Finance
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
SB0776 (HB1122) Criminal Procedure – Out of Court Statements – Child and Vulnerable Adult Victims Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2021 - 12:00 PM
SB0844 (HB1281) Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 11:53 AM
Click to return on the top page