Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Vital Records -see also- Death; Divorce; Marriage

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0230 /CH0406 (SB0267/CH0407)
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration and Local Health Departments - Death Certificates - Issuance of Copies
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0567 /CH0454 (SB0541/CH0455)
Title
Maryland Online Data Privacy Act of 2024
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0664 /CH0414 (SB0575/CH0415)
Title
Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0969 /CH0829
Title
Death Certificates - Cause or Manner of Death Determinations - Requirements After Change or Correction (Katherine Morris Death Reclassification Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0987
Title
State Government - Equal Access to Public Services for Individuals With Limited English Proficiency - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1011
Title
Vessel Transfers - Excise Tax and Title Fee Exemption and Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1298
Title
Family Law - Paternity - Surname (Maryland Paternal Naming Rights Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1310
Title
Baltimore City Coordinated Youth Violence Review and Response Team
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0267 /CH0407 (HB0230/CH0406)
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration and Local Health Departments - Death Certificates - Issuance of Copies
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0541 /CH0455 (HB0567/CH0454)
Title
Maryland Online Data Privacy Act of 2024
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0575 /CH0415 (HB0664/CH0414)
Title
Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act)
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0997
Title
Health - Vital Records - Electronic Filing and Storage
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0230 /CH0406 (SB0267/CH0407) Motor Vehicle Administration and Local Health Departments - Death Certificates - Issuance of Copies Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Health and Government Operations
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0567 /CH0454 (SB0541/CH0455) Maryland Online Data Privacy Act of 2024 Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Economic Matters
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0664 /CH0414 (SB0575/CH0415) Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act) Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Judiciary
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0969 /CH0829 Death Certificates - Cause or Manner of Death Determinations - Requirements After Change or Correction (Katherine Morris Death Reclassification Act) Delegate Bartlett 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 829
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0987 State Government - Equal Access to Public Services for Individuals With Limited English Proficiency - Modifications Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1011 Vessel Transfers - Excise Tax and Title Fee Exemption and Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1298 Family Law - Paternity - Surname (Maryland Paternal Naming Rights Act) Delegate Young 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB1310 Baltimore City Coordinated Youth Violence Review and Response Team Delegate Attar 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0267 /CH0407 (HB0230/CH0406) Motor Vehicle Administration and Local Health Departments - Death Certificates - Issuance of Copies Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0541 /CH0455 (HB0567/CH0454) Maryland Online Data Privacy Act of 2024 Senator Gile 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Finance
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0575 /CH0415 (HB0664/CH0414) Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act) Senator Corderman 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0997 Health - Vital Records - Electronic Filing and Storage Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:40 PM
Click to return on the top page