Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Vital Records

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0083 /CH0175 (SB0029)
Title
Family Law - Marriage of Minors
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0169
Title
Elections – Voter Registry – Notification and Removal of Deceased Individuals
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0369 /CH0540 (SB0377)
Title
Marriage Records – Name Change
Sponsor
Delegate Belcastro
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0370
Title
Certificates of Birth – Issuance of New Certificates – Sex Designation
Sponsor
Delegate Belcastro
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0889
Title
Public Assistance Programs - Data Sharing and Review (Welfare Program Integrity Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0900 /CH0074
Title
Death Certificates - Fees - First Responders Killed in the Line of Duty
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0029 (HB0083/CH0175)
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0377 (HB0369/CH0540)
Title
Marriage Records - Name Change
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0083 /CH0175 (SB0029) Family Law - Marriage of Minors Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Judiciary
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0169 Elections – Voter Registry – Notification and Removal of Deceased Individuals Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB0369 /CH0540 (SB0377) Marriage Records – Name Change Delegate Belcastro 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 540
Judiciary
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0370 Certificates of Birth – Issuance of New Certificates – Sex Designation Delegate Belcastro 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0889 Public Assistance Programs - Data Sharing and Review (Welfare Program Integrity Act of 2022) Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0900 /CH0074 Death Certificates - Fees - First Responders Killed in the Line of Duty Delegate McKay 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2022 - 3:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0029 (HB0083/CH0175) Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0377 (HB0369/CH0540) Marriage Records - Name Change Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (104-27)
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:11 PM
Click to return on the top page