Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Vital Records

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0549 /CH0709 (SB0215/CH0710)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Birth Registration - Gestational Carriers
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0922 /CH0421 (SB0642/CH0422)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - COVID-19-Related Death Benefits - Clarification
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0934 /CH0788
Title
Public Health – Chief Medical Examiner – Autopsy Findings and Conclusions
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0999 (SB0331)
Title
Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1076
Title
Public Assistance Programs – Data Sharing and Review (Welfare Program Integrity Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1203
Title
Certificates of Birth and Marriage Certificates - Issuance of New Certificates - Sex Designation
Sponsor
Delegate Belcastro
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0215 /CH0710 (HB0549/CH0709)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Birth Registration - Gestational Carriers
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0331 (HB0999)
Title
Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0642 /CH0422 (HB0922/CH0421)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - COVID-19-Related Death Benefits - Clarification
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0549 /CH0709 (SB0215/CH0710) Maryland Department of Health - Birth Registration - Gestational Carriers Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 709
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0922 /CH0421 (SB0642/CH0422) State Retirement and Pension System - COVID-19-Related Death Benefits - Clarification Delegate Lierman 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 421
Appropriations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0934 /CH0788 Public Health – Chief Medical Examiner – Autopsy Findings and Conclusions Delegate Bartlett 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 788
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0999 (SB0331) Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services Delegate Griffith 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Health and Government Operations
HB1076 Public Assistance Programs – Data Sharing and Review (Welfare Program Integrity Act of 2021) Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/12/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1203 Certificates of Birth and Marriage Certificates - Issuance of New Certificates - Sex Designation Delegate Belcastro 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0215 /CH0710 (HB0549/CH0709) Maryland Department of Health - Birth Registration - Gestational Carriers Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 710
Finance
1/28/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0331 (HB0999) Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Failed
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0642 /CH0422 (HB0922/CH0421) State Retirement and Pension System - COVID-19-Related Death Benefits - Clarification Senator Elfreth 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 422
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2021 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 11:54 AM
Click to return on the top page