Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Virtual Environments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0599
Title
Harford County – Board of Education – Limitations on Virtual Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0663 /CH0714 (SB0317/CH0715)
Title
State Government – Notarial Acts – Fees and Use of Communication Technology
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0807 /CH0333
Title
Real Estate Brokers, Salespersons, and Associate Brokers - Continuing Education Courses - Verification of Identity
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0848
Title
Education - Public Charter Schools - Virtual Learning Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Boteler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0958 (SB0976)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Postconviction Review – Motion for Reduction of Sentence
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1029 (SB0937)
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission – Access to Mental Health Advisory Committee – Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1147
Title
Real Property - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Virtual Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1163
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1424 (SB0782)
Title
Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0054
Title
Anne Arundel County – Marriage License Applications and Ceremonies
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0171 /CH0093
Title
Environment - Public Participation Modernization Act
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0317 /CH0715 (HB0663/CH0714)
Title
State Government – Notarial Acts – Fees and Use of Communication Technology
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0362
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0782 (HB1424)
Title
Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0836
Title
Procurement - Information Technology - Cloud-Based Virtual Desktop Infrastructure
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0935
Title
States of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Renewals - Authorization by Legislative Policy Committee
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0937 (HB1029)
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission – Access to Mental Health Advisory Committee – Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0976 (HB0958)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Postconviction Review – Motion for Reduction of Sentence
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0599 Harford County – Board of Education – Limitations on Virtual Meetings Delegate Griffith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/17/2022 - 3:00 PM
HB0663 /CH0714 (SB0317/CH0715) State Government – Notarial Acts – Fees and Use of Communication Technology Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 714
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0807 /CH0333 Real Estate Brokers, Salespersons, and Associate Brokers - Continuing Education Courses - Verification of Identity Delegate Queen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Economic Matters
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0848 Education - Public Charter Schools - Virtual Learning Programs Delegate Boteler 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0958 (SB0976) Criminal Procedure – Postconviction Review – Motion for Reduction of Sentence Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1029 (SB0937) Maryland Higher Education Commission – Access to Mental Health Advisory Committee – Establishment Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1147 Real Property - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Virtual Meetings Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1163 Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements Delegate Washington 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Ways and Means
3/09/2022 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1424 (SB0782) Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0054 Anne Arundel County – Marriage License Applications and Ceremonies Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0171 /CH0093 Environment - Public Participation Modernization Act Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2022 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0317 /CH0715 (HB0663/CH0714) State Government – Notarial Acts – Fees and Use of Communication Technology Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 715
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0362 Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements Senator Pinsky 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0782 (HB1424) Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition Senator Hester 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Finance
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Economic Matters
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0836 Procurement - Information Technology - Cloud-Based Virtual Desktop Infrastructure Senator Jennings 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0935 States of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Renewals - Authorization by Legislative Policy Committee Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0937 (HB1029) Maryland Higher Education Commission – Access to Mental Health Advisory Committee – Establishment Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0976 (HB0958) Criminal Procedure – Postconviction Review – Motion for Reduction of Sentence Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/23/2022 3:29 PM
Click to return on the top page