Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Veterinarians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1080 (SB0760)
Title
Criminal Law – Animal Cruelty – Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0156 /CH0090
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Veterinary Care of Retired Law Enforcement K-9s Act
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0760 (HB1080)
Title
Criminal Law – Animal Cruelty – Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB1080 (SB0760) Criminal Law – Animal Cruelty – Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0156 /CH0090 Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Veterinary Care of Retired Law Enforcement K-9s Act Senator Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0760 (HB1080) Criminal Law – Animal Cruelty – Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2021 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:19 AM
Click to return on the top page