Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Veterans Affairs, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0279 /CH0072 (SB0654/CH0073)
Title
Veterans Affairs - Communications, Outreach, and Advocacy Program - Veterans Advocacy and Education Act
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0625 /CH0707 (SB0440/CH0708)
Title
Commission to Study the Health Care Workforce Crisis in Maryland - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1251
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs - Burial in State Veterans' Cemeteries - Spouses and Dependents
Sponsor
Delegate Branch, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1257 (SB0155)
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1367 (SB0709/CH0731)
Title
Post-Traumatic Stress Disorder and Traumatic Brain Injury Alternative Therapies Fund - Establishment (David Perez Military Heroes Act (End 22 a Day))
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1380 /CH0422
Title
General Provisions - LGBTQ Veterans - Honorable Discharge (Restoration of Honor Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1467 (SB0994)
Title
Public Health - Mental Health Advance Directives - Awareness and Statewide Database
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0155 (HB1257)
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0236
Title
Maryland Veterans Trust Fund – CAM for Veterans Grant Program – Established (David Perez Military Heroes Act (End 22 a Day))
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0654 /CH0073 (HB0279/CH0072)
Title
Veterans Affairs - Communications, Outreach, and Advocacy Program - Veterans Advocacy and Education Act
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0709 /CH0731 (HB1367)
Title
Post-Traumatic Stress Disorder and Traumatic Brain Injury Alternative Therapies Fund - Establishment (David Perez Military Heroes Act (End 22 a Day))
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0994 (HB1467)
Title
Public Health - Mental Health Advance Directives - Awareness and Statewide Database
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0279 /CH0072 (SB0654/CH0073) Veterans Affairs - Communications, Outreach, and Advocacy Program - Veterans Advocacy and Education Act Delegate Rogers 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2022 - 3:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0625 /CH0707 (SB0440/CH0708) Commission to Study the Health Care Workforce Crisis in Maryland - Establishment Delegate Kelly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 707
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2022 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1251 Department of Veterans Affairs - Burial in State Veterans' Cemeteries - Spouses and Dependents Delegate Branch, C. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1257 (SB0155) State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act) Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1367 (SB0709/CH0731) Post-Traumatic Stress Disorder and Traumatic Brain Injury Alternative Therapies Fund - Establishment (David Perez Military Heroes Act (End 22 a Day)) Delegate Howard 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1380 /CH0422 General Provisions - LGBTQ Veterans - Honorable Discharge (Restoration of Honor Act) Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Appropriations
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1467 (SB0994) Public Health - Mental Health Advance Directives - Awareness and Statewide Database Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0155 (HB1257) State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act) Senator Young 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0236 Maryland Veterans Trust Fund – CAM for Veterans Grant Program – Established (David Perez Military Heroes Act (End 22 a Day)) Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/25/2022 - 2:30 PM
SB0654 /CH0073 (HB0279/CH0072) Veterans Affairs - Communications, Outreach, and Advocacy Program - Veterans Advocacy and Education Act Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0709 /CH0731 (HB1367) Post-Traumatic Stress Disorder and Traumatic Brain Injury Alternative Therapies Fund - Establishment (David Perez Military Heroes Act (End 22 a Day)) Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 731
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Appropriations
4/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0994 (HB1467) Public Health - Mental Health Advance Directives - Awareness and Statewide Database Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/22/2022 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:32 PM
Click to return on the top page