Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Veterans Affairs, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0078 /CH0749 (SB0052/CH0750)
Title
Public Health - Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan-Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0604 /CH0338 (SB0180/CH0339)
Title
Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Notification, Disposition, and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0660 /CH0307 (SB0284/CH0308)
Title
Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Definitions
Sponsor
Delegate Chisholm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0874 (SB0656)
Title
Maryland Veterans Trust Fund – CAM for Veterans Grant Program – Established (David Perez Military Heroes Act (End 22 a Day))
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1358 (SB0948)
Title
Veterans Affairs – Office of Communications and Public Affairs – Veterans Advocacy and Education Act
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0052 /CH0750 (HB0078/CH0749)
Title
Public Health – Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan–Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0180 /CH0339 (HB0604/CH0338)
Title
Funeral Establishments and Crematories – Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans – Notification, Disposition, and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0284 /CH0308 (HB0660/CH0307)
Title
Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Definitions
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0656 (HB0874)
Title
Maryland Veterans Trust Fund – CAM for Veterans Grant Program – Established (David Perez Military Heroes Act (End 22 a Day))
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0948 (HB1358)
Title
Veterans Affairs – Office of Communications and Public Affairs – Veterans Advocacy and Education Act
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0078 /CH0749 (SB0052/CH0750) Public Health - Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan-Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021) Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 749
Health and Government Operations
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0604 /CH0338 (SB0180/CH0339) Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Notification, Disposition, and Reporting Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0660 /CH0307 (SB0284/CH0308) Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Definitions Delegate Chisholm 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0874 (SB0656) Maryland Veterans Trust Fund – CAM for Veterans Grant Program – Established (David Perez Military Heroes Act (End 22 a Day)) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1358 (SB0948) Veterans Affairs – Office of Communications and Public Affairs – Veterans Advocacy and Education Act Delegate Rogers 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
SB0052 /CH0750 (HB0078/CH0749) Public Health – Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan–Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021) Senator Washington 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 750
Finance
Health and Government Operations
SB0180 /CH0339 (HB0604/CH0338) Funeral Establishments and Crematories – Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans – Notification, Disposition, and Reporting Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0284 /CH0308 (HB0660/CH0307) Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Definitions Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2021 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0656 (HB0874) Maryland Veterans Trust Fund – CAM for Veterans Grant Program – Established (David Perez Military Heroes Act (End 22 a Day)) Senator Salling 2 2 In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0948 (HB1358) Veterans Affairs – Office of Communications and Public Affairs – Veterans Advocacy and Education Act Senator Klausmeier 5 2 In the House - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:18 AM
Click to return on the top page