Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Vending Machines

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0367 /CH0337 (SB0527/CH0338)
Title
Community Colleges - Contraception - Access Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0735 (SB0642)
Title
Maryland Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Program
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1171 /CH0933 (SB0944/CH0932)
Title
Nonprescription Drugs and Devices – Provision by Registered Nurses and Sale of Contraceptives Through Automatic Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1306
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Food and Beverages
Sponsor
Delegate Fair
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1515
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction and Services
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0527 /CH0338 (HB0367/CH0337)
Title
Community Colleges - Contraception - Access Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0642 (HB0735)
Title
Maryland Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Program
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0944 /CH0932 (HB1171/CH0933)
Title
Nonprescription Drugs and Devices - Provision by Registered Nurses and Sale of Contraceptives Through Automatic Devices
Sponsor
Senator Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0367 /CH0337 (SB0527/CH0338) Community Colleges - Contraception - Access Requirements Delegate Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Appropriations
2/13/2024 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0735 (SB0642) Maryland Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Program Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1171 /CH0933 (SB0944/CH0932) Nonprescription Drugs and Devices – Provision by Registered Nurses and Sale of Contraceptives Through Automatic Devices Delegate Williams 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 933
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2024 - 2:00 PM
Finance
Judicial Proceedings
HB1306 Admissions and Amusement Tax - Food and Beverages Delegate Fair 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1515 Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction and Services Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2024 - 11:00 AM
SB0527 /CH0338 (HB0367/CH0337) Community Colleges - Contraception - Access Requirements Senator Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2024 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0642 (HB0735) Maryland Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Program Senator Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0944 /CH0932 (HB1171/CH0933) Nonprescription Drugs and Devices - Provision by Registered Nurses and Sale of Contraceptives Through Automatic Devices Senator Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 932
Finance
3/12/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2024 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:44 PM
Click to return on the top page