Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Vandalism

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0128 /CH0385 (SB0220/CH0386)
Title
Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0286 (SB0099)
Title
Hate Crimes – Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0438 (SB0443)
Title
Crimes – Malicious Destruction of Historically Significant Monument (Monument Protection Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Mangione
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0498
Title
First Amendment Activities and Associations - Use of Vehicle to Interfere or Damage Property
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1047
Title
Mail–In Voting Enhancement Act
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1228
Title
Election Law - Ballot Drop Boxes - Prohibited Acts
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0099 (HB0286)
Title
Hate Crimes - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0220 /CH0386 (HB0128/CH0385)
Title
Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0443 (HB0438)
Title
Crimes - Malicious Destruction of Historically Significant Monument (Monument Protection Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0713
Title
Election Law – Theft or Destruction of Campaign Signs – Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0867
Title
Criminal Law – Hate Crimes – First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0128 /CH0385 (SB0220/CH0386) Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties Delegate Stewart 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 385
Judiciary
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0286 (SB0099) Hate Crimes – Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0438 (SB0443) Crimes – Malicious Destruction of Historically Significant Monument (Monument Protection Act of 2021) Delegate Mangione 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0498 First Amendment Activities and Associations - Use of Vehicle to Interfere or Damage Property Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1047 Mail–In Voting Enhancement Act Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the Senate - Senate Refuses to Recede
Ways and Means
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1228 Election Law - Ballot Drop Boxes - Prohibited Acts Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0099 (HB0286) Hate Crimes - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0220 /CH0386 (HB0128/CH0385) Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties Senator Hettleman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 386
Judicial Proceedings
1/20/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
SB0443 (HB0438) Crimes - Malicious Destruction of Historically Significant Monument (Monument Protection Act of 2021) Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0713 Election Law – Theft or Destruction of Campaign Signs – Penalties Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0867 Criminal Law – Hate Crimes – First Responders Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2021 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 10:22 AM
Click to return on the top page