Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Urban Renewal -see also- Commercial Rehabilitation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0156
Title
Local Governments – Urban Agricultural Incentive Zones – Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0528 /CH0599
Title
Town of Williamsport (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0543 /CH0600
Title
Town of Hancock (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0046
Title
Housing and Community Development - Programs and Projects - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0156 Local Governments – Urban Agricultural Incentive Zones – Authorization Delegate Queen 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0528 /CH0599 Town of Williamsport (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance Delegate McKay 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 599
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0543 /CH0600 Town of Hancock (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance Delegate McKay 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 600
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0046 Housing and Community Development - Programs and Projects - Requirements Senator McCray 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:15 PM
Click to return on the top page