Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Urban Areas

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0156
Title
Local Governments – Urban Agricultural Incentive Zones – Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0376
Title
Outdoor Preschool License Pilot Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0443 (SB0228/CH0037)
Title
Maryland Corps Program - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0540 /CH0172 (SB0437/CH0173)
Title
Agriculture - University of Maryland Extension - Urban Farmer Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0708
Title
Comprehensive Climate Solutions
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0725 /CH0499 (SB0506/CH0498)
Title
Children - Therapeutic Child Care Grant Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0749 /CH0470
Title
Natural Resources - Maryland Park Explorers Grant Pilot Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0855 /CH0393 (SB0942/CH0394)
Title
Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Water and Power Infrastructure Grant Program and Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0894
Title
Transportation Electrification and Modernization (TEAM) Act
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1031 (SB0791)
Title
Natural Resources - Land Conservation - Establishment of Goals and Programs (Maryland the Beautiful Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1070
Title
Solid Waste Disposal and Diversion and On–Farm Composting and Compost Use
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1216
Title
Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0228 /CH0037 (HB0443)
Title
Maryland Corps Program – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0437 /CH0173 (HB0540/CH0172)
Title
Agriculture - University of Maryland Extension - Urban Farmer Assistance
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0506 /CH0498 (HB0725/CH0499)
Title
Children - Therapeutic Child Care Grant Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0528 /CH0038
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0601
Title
Baltimore City Soil Conservation District - Establishment - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0791 (HB1031)
Title
Natural Resources - Land Conservation - Establishment of Goals and Programs (Maryland the Beautiful Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0841
Title
Morgan State University - Carnegie Classification - Doctoral University With Very High Research Activity
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0942 /CH0394 (HB0855/CH0393)
Title
Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Water and Power Infrastructure Grant Program and Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0156 Local Governments – Urban Agricultural Incentive Zones – Authorization Delegate Queen 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0376 Outdoor Preschool License Pilot Program - Establishment Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0443 (SB0228/CH0037) Maryland Corps Program - Revisions Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0540 /CH0172 (SB0437/CH0173) Agriculture - University of Maryland Extension - Urban Farmer Assistance Delegate Henson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Appropriations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0708 Comprehensive Climate Solutions Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0725 /CH0499 (SB0506/CH0498) Children - Therapeutic Child Care Grant Program - Establishment Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 499
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0749 /CH0470 Natural Resources - Maryland Park Explorers Grant Pilot Program - Establishment Delegate Guyton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0855 /CH0393 (SB0942/CH0394) Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Water and Power Infrastructure Grant Program and Fund - Establishment Delegate Boyce 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB0894 Transportation Electrification and Modernization (TEAM) Act Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1031 (SB0791) Natural Resources - Land Conservation - Establishment of Goals and Programs (Maryland the Beautiful Act) Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1070 Solid Waste Disposal and Diversion and On–Farm Composting and Compost Use Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1216 Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Fund Delegate Wells 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0228 /CH0037 (HB0443) Maryland Corps Program – Revisions Senator Ferguson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 37
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Appropriations
3/22/2022 - 1:40 PM
SB0437 /CH0173 (HB0540/CH0172) Agriculture - University of Maryland Extension - Urban Farmer Assistance Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0506 /CH0498 (HB0725/CH0499) Children - Therapeutic Child Care Grant Program - Establishment Senator King 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 498
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0528 /CH0038 Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022 Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 38
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0601 Baltimore City Soil Conservation District - Establishment - Requirements Senator McCray 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0791 (HB1031) Natural Resources - Land Conservation - Establishment of Goals and Programs (Maryland the Beautiful Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2022 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0841 Morgan State University - Carnegie Classification - Doctoral University With Very High Research Activity Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2022 - 1:03 PM
Appropriations
4/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0942 /CH0394 (HB0855/CH0393) Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Water and Power Infrastructure Grant Program and Fund - Establishment Senator Griffith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 1:11 PM
Click to return on the top page