Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Unions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0172
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Union Dues
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0355 /CH0217
Title
Prince George's County Board of Education - Workgroup, Alterations, and Orientation Requirement PG 503-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1203
Title
Labor and Employment - Private-Sector Employers - Right to Work
Sponsor
Delegate Chisholm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1245 (SB0964)
Title
Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor, Job Training, and Educational Courses
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0964 (HB1245)
Title
Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor, Job Training, and Educational Courses
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0172 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Union Dues Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Ways and Means
1/18/2022 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0355 /CH0217 Prince George's County Board of Education - Workgroup, Alterations, and Orientation Requirement PG 503-22 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1203 Labor and Employment - Private-Sector Employers - Right to Work Delegate Chisholm 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1245 (SB0964) Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor, Job Training, and Educational Courses Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
SB0964 (HB1245) Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor, Job Training, and Educational Courses Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/31/2022 5:13 PM
Click to return on the top page