Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Unions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0013 /CH0737
Title
Influence on Collective Bargaining - Prohibition on Use of Public Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 (SB0194)
Title
Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor, Job Training, and Educational Courses
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0179
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Union Dues
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0184
Title
University System of Maryland, Morgan State University, and St. Mary's College of Maryland - Board Membership - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0940 /CH0356
Title
Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering - Supplementary Appropriation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1207 /CH0634 (SB0674/CH0635)
Title
Environment - Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities - Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0194 (HB0102)
Title
Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor, Job Training, and Educational Courses
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0674 /CH0635 (HB1207/CH0634)
Title
Environment - Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities - Reform
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0013 /CH0737 Influence on Collective Bargaining - Prohibition on Use of Public Funds Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 737
Appropriations
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
Finance
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0102 (SB0194) Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor, Job Training, and Educational Courses Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0179 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Union Dues Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0184 University System of Maryland, Morgan State University, and St. Mary's College of Maryland - Board Membership - Alterations Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0940 /CH0356 Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering - Supplementary Appropriation Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Ways and Means
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1207 /CH0634 (SB0674/CH0635) Environment - Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities - Reform Delegate Bridges 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 634
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0194 (HB0102) Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor, Job Training, and Educational Courses Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
2/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0674 /CH0635 (HB1207/CH0634) Environment - Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities - Reform Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 635
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:18 AM
Click to return on the top page