Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Unfair Trade Practices

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0057
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Rate Filings - Trade Secrets and Factors Used to Establish Rates
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0070 (SB0315)
Title
Courts – Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0111 (SB0732)
Title
Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0259 (SB0335)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Data Privacy
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0526 /CH0598
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Plumbing and Fuel Gas Services - Licenses and Penalties PG/MC 109-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0562
Title
Consumer Protection - Right to Repair - Farm Equipment
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0800 (SB0565)
Title
Public Safety – Emergency Management – Price Gouging Consumer Protections
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0804 /CH0106 (SB0252/CH0107)
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Enhanced Consumer Protections and Enforcement Tools
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1459
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection Act - Floral Wire Services
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0252 /CH0107 (HB0804/CH0106)
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Enhanced Consumer Protections and Enforcement Tools
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0315 (HB0070)
Title
Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0565 (HB0800)
Title
Public Safety - Emergency Management - Price Gouging Consumer Protections
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0639
Title
Consumer Protection – Security Questions and Measures
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0732 (HB0111)
Title
Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0057 Motor Vehicle Insurance - Rate Filings - Trade Secrets and Factors Used to Establish Rates Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0070 (SB0315) Courts – Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0111 (SB0732) Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Appropriations
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
HB0259 (SB0335) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Data Privacy Delegate Love 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Economic Matters
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0526 /CH0598 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Plumbing and Fuel Gas Services - Licenses and Penalties PG/MC 109-22 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 598
Economic Matters
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0562 Consumer Protection - Right to Repair - Farm Equipment Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0800 (SB0565) Public Safety – Emergency Management – Price Gouging Consumer Protections Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0804 /CH0106 (SB0252/CH0107) Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Enhanced Consumer Protections and Enforcement Tools Delegate Queen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Economic Matters
Finance
HB1459 Commercial Law - Consumer Protection Act - Floral Wire Services Delegate Griffith 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
SB0252 /CH0107 (HB0804/CH0106) Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Enhanced Consumer Protections and Enforcement Tools Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107
Finance
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0315 (HB0070) Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0565 (HB0800) Public Safety - Emergency Management - Price Gouging Consumer Protections Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0639 Consumer Protection – Security Questions and Measures Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0732 (HB0111) Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents Senator Watson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:08 PM
Click to return on the top page