Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Unfair Trade Practices

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0026
Title
Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0161 (SB0379)
Title
Health Occupation – Licensing of Audiology Assistants
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0168 (SB0552)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance Use of Credit History Rating Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0221
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0233 (SB0082)
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Maryland Music Therapists Act
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0340
Title
Commercial Law – Retail Transactions – Cash Payments (Cash Transactions Preservation Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0518 (SB0432)
Title
Public Libraries - Electronic Literary Product Licenses - Access
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0554 (SB0507)
Title
Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0819 (SB0615)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Prohibited Actions
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0082 (HB0233)
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Maryland Music Therapists Act
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0238
Title
Consumer Protection - Banking Institutions - Unauthorized Debit Transactions (Consumer Bank Deposits Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0379 (HB0161)
Title
Health Occupations - Licensing of Audiology Assistants
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0432 (HB0518)
Title
Public Libraries - Electronic Literary Product Licenses - Access
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0507 (HB0554)
Title
Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0552 (HB0168)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance Use of Credit History Rating Policy
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0615 (HB0819)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Prohibited Actions
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0026 Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0161 (SB0379) Health Occupation – Licensing of Audiology Assistants Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0168 (SB0552) Motor Vehicle Insurance Use of Credit History Rating Policy Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0221 Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies Delegate Turner 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Economic Matters
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0233 (SB0082) State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Maryland Music Therapists Act Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0340 Commercial Law – Retail Transactions – Cash Payments (Cash Transactions Preservation Act) Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0518 (SB0432) Public Libraries - Electronic Literary Product Licenses - Access Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
2/05/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0554 (SB0507) Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Health and Government Operations
2/03/2021 - 2:30 PM
Finance
HB0819 (SB0615) Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Prohibited Actions Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0082 (HB0233) State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Maryland Music Therapists Act Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0238 Consumer Protection - Banking Institutions - Unauthorized Debit Transactions (Consumer Bank Deposits Protection Act) Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0379 (HB0161) Health Occupations - Licensing of Audiology Assistants Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0432 (HB0518) Public Libraries - Electronic Literary Product Licenses - Access Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2021 - 11:00 AM
Ways and Means
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0507 (HB0554) Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Finance
2/18/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0552 (HB0168) Motor Vehicle Insurance Use of Credit History Rating Policy Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0615 (HB0819) Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Prohibited Actions Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 12:54 PM
Click to return on the top page